EP0183194 - Menadioncholine-bisulfite adduct and process for its preparation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.08.1988 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.10.1988 [1988/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/23] | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 D-67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schneider, Joachim U., Dr. Plauserstrasse 17 D-6719 Weisenheim / DE | 02 /
Kiefer, Hans, Dr. Im Sandgarten 5 D-6706 Wachenheim / DE | [1986/23] | Application number, filing date | 85114798.3 | 21.11.1985 | [1986/23] | Priority number, date | DE19843443270 | 28.11.1984 Original published format: DE 3443270 | [1986/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0183194 | Date: | 04.06.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/23] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0183194 | Date: | 30.07.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0183194 | Date: | 21.10.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.06.1986 | Classification | IPC: | C07C143/20, C07C91/26, A61K31/185, A23K1/16 | [1986/23] | CPC: |
A61K31/185 (EP,US);
A23K20/174 (EP,US);
A61P7/04 (EP);
C07C309/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1986/23] | Title | German: | Menadioncholinbisulfit-Addukt und Verfahren zu dessen Herstellung | [1986/23] | English: | Menadioncholine-bisulfite adduct and process for its preparation | [1986/23] | French: | Conjugué de ménadioncholine et de bisulphite ainsi que procédé pour sa préparation | [1986/23] | Examination procedure | 18.06.1986 | Examination requested [1986/34] | 18.03.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 27.04.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.06.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 30.06.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.07.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/41] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CH260991 (ABBOTT LAB [US]); | [XD]GB771180 (ABBOTT LAB); | [XD]DE1033017 (ABBOTT LAB) |