EP0182381 - Carton blank for making a cassette [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1986/22] | Carton blank for making a cassette, and cassette made from such a blank | ||
[1990/10] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.12.1990 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UNILEVER N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1986/22] | For all designated states UNILEVER N.V. Weena 455 NL-3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gaube, Günther Theobald Eichendorffweg 4 D-8960 Kempten / DE | [1986/22] | Representative(s) | Hutzelmann, Gerhard, et al Schloss 89296 Osterberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/22] | Hutzelmann, Gerhard, et al Duracher Strasse 22 D-87437 Kempten / DE | Application number, filing date | 85114801.5 | 21.11.1985 | [1986/22] | Priority number, date | DE19840034292U | 23.11.1984 Original published format: DE 8434292 U | [1986/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0182381 | Date: | 28.05.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0182381 | Date: | 30.03.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0182381 | Date: | 07.03.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.02.1988 | Classification | IPC: | B65D5/18 | [1986/22] | CPC: |
B65D5/18 (EP);
G11B23/0233 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, NL [1986/22] | Title | German: | Zuschnitt aus Karton od. dgl. zum Herstellen einer Kassette | [1990/10] | English: | Carton blank for making a cassette | [1990/10] | French: | Flan en carton pour la fabrication d'une cassette | [1990/10] |
Former [1986/22] | Zuschnitt aus Karton od. dgl. zum Herstellen einer Kassette und daraus hergestellte Kassette | ||
Former [1986/22] | Carton blank for making a cassette, and cassette made from such a blank | ||
Former [1986/22] | Flan en carton pour la fabrication d'une cassette et cassette ainsi obtenue | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Examination procedure | 18.06.1988 | Examination requested [1988/33] | 17.10.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.02.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.05.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.08.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.11.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 10.11.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.12.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.10.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.10.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.11.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 07.03.1990 | FR | 07.03.1990 | NL | 07.03.1990 | [2006/14] |
Former [1991/35] | BE | 07.03.1990 | |
NL | 07.03.1990 | ||
FR | 27.07.1990 | ||
Former [1991/17] | BE | 07.03.1990 | |
NL | 07.03.1990 | ||
Former [1990/44] | NL | 07.03.1990 | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]DE3047056 (4 P NICOLAUS KEMPTEN GMBH [DE], et al); | [Y]DE1807679 (AKERLUND & RAUSING AB); | [A]AT374952B (FALPA VERPACKUNG & OFFSETDRUCK [AT]) |