EP0186782 - A synergistic admixture containing "-bromo-2-bromomethylglutaronitrile and methylene bis (thiocyanate) and process for inhibiting microbial growth using said components [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.04.1990 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.04.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.05.1990 [1990/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CALGON CORPORATION Route 60-Campbell's Run Road Robinson Township Pennsylvania 15205 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1986/28] | For all designated states CALGON CORPORATION Route 60-Campbell's Run Road Robinson Township Pennsylvania 15205 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jakubowski, John A. 5 Winterberry Circle Piscataway, N.J. 08854 / US | [1986/28] | Representative(s) | Blum, Rudolf Emil, et al E. BLUM & Co. AG Patent- und Markenanwälte VSP Vorderberg 11 8044 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1986/28] | Blum, Rudolf Emil Ernst, et al c/o E. Blum & Co Patentanwälte Vorderberg 11 CH-8044 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 85114952.6 | 26.11.1985 | [1986/28] | Priority number, date | US19840679430 | 07.12.1984 Original published format: US 679430 | [1986/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0186782 | Date: | 09.07.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0186782 | Date: | 07.06.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.05.1986 | Classification | IPC: | A01N47/48, // (A01N47/48, 37:34) | [1986/28] | CPC: |
A01N47/48 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
A01N47/48, A01N2300/00 (US,EP);
A01N47/48, A01N37/34 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/28] | Title | German: | 2-Brom-2-brommethylglutaronitril und Methylen-bis-thiocyanat enthaltende synergistische Mischung und Verfahren zur Hemmung des Mikrobenwachstums mittels genannter Bestandteile | [1986/28] | English: | A synergistic admixture containing "-bromo-2-bromomethylglutaronitrile and methylene bis (thiocyanate) and process for inhibiting microbial growth using said components | [1986/28] | French: | Mélange synergique contenant le 2-bromo-2-bromométhylglutaronitrile et le méthylène bis(thiocyanate) et procédé pour inhiber la croissance des micro-organismes en utilisant lesdits composants | [1986/28] | Examination procedure | 20.09.1986 | Examination requested [1986/47] | 04.02.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.05.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 23.11.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 02.12.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.01.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 07.01.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.03.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.09.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1104367 (NALCO CHEMICAL CO); | [AD]US3833731 (GRIER N, et al); | [A]EP0058274 (BETZ EUROP INC [US]) |