EP0183223 - Electronic ignition device for internal combustion engines [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.12.1991 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 29.10.2008 [2008/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIPPONDENSO CO., LTD. 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-shi Aichi-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1986/23] | For all designated states NIPPONDENSO CO., LTD. 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-shi Aichi-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Morino, Seiji 32-1, Aza Kuranishi Akashibu-cho Okazaki-shi Aichi-ken / JP | 02 /
Uno, Eiichi 58-8, Itsutsubata Iwakura-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken / JP | 03 /
Yoshitani, Yoshihiro 5-33-1, Tenno-cho Kariya-shi Aichi-ken / JP | [1986/23] | Representative(s) | Klingseisen, Franz, et al Klingseisen, Rings & Partner Patentanwälte Bräuhausstrasse 2 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/44] | Klingseisen, Franz, et al Klingseisen & Partner Bräuhausstrasse 2 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [1986/23] | Klingseisen, Franz, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte, Dr. F. Zumstein, Dipl.-Ing. F. Klingseisen, Bräuhausstrasse 4 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 85114978.1 | 26.11.1985 | [1986/23] | Priority number, date | JP19840249895 | 26.11.1984 Original published format: JP 24989584 | JP19850137151 | 24.06.1985 Original published format: JP 13715185 | [1986/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0183223 | Date: | 04.06.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/23] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0183223 | Date: | 25.03.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0183223 | Date: | 20.02.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.02.1987 | Classification | IPC: | F02P9/00 | [1986/23] | CPC: |
F02P9/002 (EP,US);
F02P3/00 (KR);
F02P3/0884 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1986/23] | Title | German: | Elektronische Zündanlage für Brennkraftmaschine | [1986/23] | English: | Electronic ignition device for internal combustion engines | [1986/23] | French: | Allumage électronique pour moteur à combustion interne | [1986/23] | Examination procedure | 13.05.1987 | Examination requested [1987/29] | 23.02.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.07.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.03.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 21.05.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.07.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.08.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.11.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 23.11.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.11.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.11.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.11.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.11.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP57024450 ; | [X]US3504230 (GADDES EDWARD D); | [A]DE2657186 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT); | [A]US3980922 (KATSUMATA MITSUO, et al); | [A]GB2087483 (FORD MOTOR CO) | [A] - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 6, no. 86 (M-131)[964], 25th May 1982; & JP-A-57 024 450 (NIPPON JIDOSHA BUHIN SOGO KENKYUSHO K.K.) 09-02-1982, & JP57024450 A 00000000 |