EP0183227 - Digital signal multiplexing method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1986/23] | Digital signal multiplexing apparatus | ||
[1989/23] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.04.1990 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 31.10.2007 [2007/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/23] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stummer, Baldur, Dipl.-Ing. Wilhelm-Kuhnert-Strasse 21 D-8000 München 90 / DE | [1986/23] | Application number, filing date | 85114994.8 | 26.11.1985 | [1986/23] | Priority number, date | DE19843443239 | 27.11.1984 Original published format: DE 3443239 | [1986/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0183227 | Date: | 04.06.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0183227 | Date: | 07.06.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.04.1986 | Classification | IPC: | H04J3/07 | [1986/23] | CPC: |
H04J3/1641 (EP,US);
H04J3/073 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1986/23] | Title | German: | Digitalsignal-Multiplexverfahren | [1989/23] | English: | Digital signal multiplexing method | [1989/23] | French: | Procédé de multiplexage de signaux numériques | [1989/23] |
Former [1986/23] | Digitalsignal-Multiplexgerät | ||
Former [1986/23] | Digital signal multiplexing apparatus | ||
Former [1986/23] | Appareil de multiplexage de signaux numériques | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 27.10.1986 | Examination requested [1986/52] | 13.06.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.08.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.09.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.11.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.12.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 07.12.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.03.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.11.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 07.06.1989 | FR | 07.06.1989 | GB | 07.06.1989 | IT | 07.06.1989 | NL | 07.06.1989 | SE | 07.06.1989 | AT | 26.11.1989 | CH | 30.11.1989 | LI | 30.11.1989 | [2002/24] |
Former [1999/42] | BE | 07.06.1989 | |
GB | 07.06.1989 | ||
IT | 07.06.1989 | ||
NL | 07.06.1989 | ||
SE | 07.06.1989 | ||
AT | 26.11.1989 | ||
CH | 30.11.1989 | ||
LI | 30.11.1989 | ||
Former [1991/29] | BE | 07.06.1989 | |
GB | 07.06.1989 | ||
NL | 07.06.1989 | ||
SE | 07.06.1989 | ||
AT | 26.11.1989 | ||
CH | 30.11.1989 | ||
LI | 30.11.1989 | ||
Former [1991/11] | BE | 07.06.1989 | |
GB | 07.06.1989 | ||
NL | 07.06.1989 | ||
SE | 07.06.1989 | ||
CH | 30.11.1989 | ||
LI | 30.11.1989 | ||
Former [1990/46] | GB | 07.06.1989 | |
NL | 07.06.1989 | ||
SE | 07.06.1989 | ||
CH | 30.11.1989 | ||
LI | 30.11.1989 | ||
Former [1990/42] | GB | 07.06.1989 | |
NL | 07.06.1989 | ||
SE | 07.06.1989 | ||
Former [1990/12] | NL | 07.06.1989 | |
SE | 07.06.1989 | ||
Former [1989/43] | SE | 07.06.1989 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3213534 (KRONE GMBH [DE]) | [A] - 1972 INTERNATIONAL ZURICH SEMINAR ON INTEGRATED SYSTEMS FOR SPEECH, VIDEO AND DATA COMMUNICATIONS, 15.-17. März 1972, Zürich, CH, Seiten A2(1) - A2(7); T.S. HUANG et al.: "Image processing in communication systems" |