EP0183276 - Flame-retardant resin composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.01.1989 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI RAYON CO., LTD. 3-19, Kyobashi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8350 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1986/23] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI RAYON CO., LTD. 3-19, Kyobashi 2-chome Chuo-Ku Tokyo 104 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kishida, Kazuo 74-404, Ohno-cho Saiki-gun Hiroshima-ken / JP | 02 /
Kawasaki, Hiroshi 2-47-7, Takafunedai Kanazawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | 03 /
Ono, Kenzo 2-2, Kurokawa 3-chome Ohtake-shi Hiroshima-ken / JP | [1986/23] | Representative(s) | Struif, Bernward, et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke, Bühling, Kinne Grupe, Pellmann, Grams, Struif Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/23] | Struif, Bernward, Dipl.-Chem. Dr., et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke, Bühling, Kinne Grupe, Pellmann, Grams, Struif Bavariaring 4 D-80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 85115191.0 | 29.11.1985 | [1986/23] | Priority number, date | JP19840251562 | 30.11.1984 Original published format: JP 25156284 | [1986/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0183276 | Date: | 04.06.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/23] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0183276 | Date: | 20.01.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.12.1987 | Classification | IPC: | C08L25/04, C08K13/02, // (C08K13/02, 3:22, 5:06, 5:13, 5:13),(C08K13/02, 3:22, 5:06, 5:13, 5:34),(C08L25/04, 23:28, 69:00) | [1986/23] | CPC: |
C08K5/06 (EP);
C08K13/02 (EP);
C08L25/04 (EP);
C08L2201/02 (EP);
C08L23/286 (EP);
C08L69/00 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C08K13/02, C08L25/04 (EP);
C08K5/06, C08L25/04 (EP);
C08L25/04, C08L2666/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1986/23] | Title | German: | Flammhemmende Harzmischung | [1986/23] | English: | Flame-retardant resin composition | [1986/23] | French: | Composition de résine retardatrice de flamme | [1986/23] | File destroyed: | 03.05.1995 | Examination procedure | 21.07.1988 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1989/10] | 14.10.1988 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1989/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 20.07.1988 | M02   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]EP0156219 ; | [Y]US3061584 ; | [Y]FR2187825 ; | [YD]US4016137 |