EP0190430 - Method and arrangement for heating foodstuffs [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.01.1991 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.1997 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 23.04.1997 [1997/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOCIETE DES PRODUITS NESTLE S.A. Case postale 353 1800 Vevey / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1986/33] | For all designated states SOCIETE DES PRODUITS NESTLE S.A. Case postale 353 CH-1800 Vevey / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Le Viet, Toai Sentier de Clies CH-1800 Vevey / CH | [1986/33] | Application number, filing date | 85115379.1 | 04.12.1985 | [1986/33] | Priority number, date | CH19850000329 | 25.01.1985 Original published format: CH 32985 | [1986/33] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0190430 | Date: | 13.08.1986 | Language: | FR | [1986/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0190430 | Date: | 14.03.1990 | Language: | FR | [1990/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.06.1986 | Classification | IPC: | H05B6/80 | [1986/33] | CPC: |
H05B6/6411 (EP,US);
A47J37/043 (EP,US);
Y10S99/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, FR, IT, LU, NL, SE [1986/33] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Erhitzen von Lebensmitteln | [1986/33] | English: | Method and arrangement for heating foodstuffs | [1986/33] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour le réchauffement d'aliments | [1986/33] | Examination procedure | 04.12.1985 | Examination requested [1986/33] | 07.07.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.10.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.08.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.09.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.11.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 02.11.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.12.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.10.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US1870476 (BABCOCK RICHARD J); | [A]US3427422 (MULLER PAUL CURT); | [YD]US3676058 (GRAY OSCAR S); | [Y]US4286133 (EINSET EYSTEIN, et al); | [A]FR2507060 (DUR OEUF SA [FR]); | [A]EP0132080 (MICROWAVE OVENS LTD [GB]) |