EP0184202 - Fixing device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.03.1991 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.03.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.05.1991 [1991/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KONICA CORPORATION 26-2, Nishishinjuku 1-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1986/24] | For all designated states KONICA CORPORATION 26-2, Nishi-shinjuku 1-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mogi, Michio 1097 Tate-machi 2-11-1017 Hachioji-shi Tokyo / JP | [1986/24] | Representative(s) | Henkel & Partner mbB Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/24] | Henkel, Feiler, Hänzel & Partner Möhlstrasse 37 D-81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 85115403.9 | 04.12.1985 | [1986/24] | Priority number, date | JP19840258111 | 05.12.1984 Original published format: JP 25811184 | [1986/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0184202 | Date: | 11.06.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0184202 | Date: | 30.12.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0184202 | Date: | 23.05.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.11.1986 | Classification | IPC: | G03G15/20 | [1986/24] | CPC: |
G03G15/2053 (EP,US);
G03G15/2064 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | GB [1990/06] |
Former [1986/24] | DE, FR, GB | Title | German: | Fixiervorrichtung | [1986/24] | English: | Fixing device | [1986/24] | French: | Dispositif de fixage | [1986/24] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 23.06.1987 | Examination requested [1987/35] | 16.12.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.06.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.07.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.11.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.02.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 07.02.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.02.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.12.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.12.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2329694 ; | [A]DE1816174 ; | [A]DE2444435 (CANON KK); | [A]GB2069931 (KONISHIROKU PHOTO IND); | [A]US4258089 (ANDERSON EDWARD P, et al); | [A]DE1546792 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 3, no. 99 (E-132), 22nd August 1979, page 97 E 132; JP - A - 54 78140 (RICOH) 22-06-1979 |