EP0186003 - Injection unit for a plastic material injection-moulding machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.03.1989 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.03.1989 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.05.1989 [1989/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hehl, Karl Arthur-Hehl-Strasse 32 72290 Lossburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/27] | For all designated states Hehl, Karl Arthur-Hehl-Strasse 32 D-72290 Lossburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1986/27] | Representative(s) | Mayer, Friedrich E. Patentanwälte Mayer, Frank, Reinhardt, Westliche 24 D-75172 Pforzheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/27] | Mayer, Friedrich Dr. Patentanwälte Mayer, Frank, Reinhardt, Westliche 24 D-75172 Pforzheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 85115506.9 | 06.12.1985 | [1986/27] | Priority number, date | DE19843447597 | 28.12.1984 Original published format: DE 3447597 | [1986/27] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0186003 | Date: | 02.07.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0186003 | Date: | 23.03.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.02.1988 | Classification | IPC: | B29C45/07, B29C45/17 | [1988/11] | CPC: |
B29C45/07 (EP,US);
B29C45/1761 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1986/27] | B29C45/07 | Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1986/27] | Title | German: | Spritzgiesseinheit für eine Kunststoff-Spritzgiessmaschine | [1986/27] | English: | Injection unit for a plastic material injection-moulding machine | [1986/27] | French: | Groupe d'injection pour machine de moulage par injection de matière plastique | [1986/27] | File destroyed: | 09.05.1995 | Examination procedure | 24.09.1988 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1989/19] | 19.12.1988 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1989/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 23.09.1988 | M02   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]DE2020337 (HEHL KARL); | [Y]US3335464 (SCHWARTZ WILLIAM H); | [Y]DE1931432 (FAHR BUCHER GMBH); | [Y]DE1915394 (FAHR BUCHER GMBH); | [Y]DE2437248 (SCHLOEMANN SIEMAG AG); | [A]GB1301018 (PLAST ELASTVERARBEITUNGSMASCH [DE]) |