EP0184801 - Chromene derivative, process for preparing the same and antiallergic agent containing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.07.1991 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 31.10.2007 [2007/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kaken Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. No. 28-8, Honkomagome 2-chome Bunkyo-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1986/25] | For all designated states Kaken Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. No. 28-8, Honkomagome 2-chome Bunkyo-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nakano, Jun 1180-5, Katsube-cho Moriyama-shi Shiga-ken / JP | 02 /
Awaji, Toshikazu 253-2, Yukihata Yasu-cho Yasu-gun Shiga-ken / JP | 03 /
Kuriyama, Kiyoshi 6-46, Nomi-cho Takatsuki-shi Osaka-fu / JP | 04 /
Hiyama, Yoshiyuki Misoradanchi 8-304 1-3, Misora-cho Otsu-shi Shiga-ken / JP | 05 /
Okuda, Toshiaki 4-10-20, Higashiyagura Kusatsu-shi Shiga-ken / JP | [1986/25] | Representative(s) | Gille Hrabal Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Patentanwälte Brucknerstraße 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/19] | Türk, Gille, Hrabal, Leifert Brucknerstrasse 20 D-40593 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [1987/13] | Türk, Dietmar, Dr. rer. nat. Türk, Gille, Hrabal, Leifert Patentanwälte Brucknerstrasse 20 D-40593 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [1986/25] | Türk, Dietmar, Dr. rer. nat. Türk, Gille + Hrabal Patentanwälte Bruckner Strasse 20 D-40593 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 85115606.7 | 07.12.1985 | [1986/25] | Priority number, date | JP19840261039 | 10.12.1984 Original published format: JP 26103984 | [1986/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0184801 | Date: | 18.06.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0184801 | Date: | 26.09.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.04.1986 | Classification | IPC: | C07D405/04, A61K31/41 | [1986/25] | CPC: |
C07D405/04 (EP,US);
A61P37/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1986/25] | Title | German: | Chromenderivate, Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung und diese enthaltendes anti-allergisches Mittel | [1986/25] | English: | Chromene derivative, process for preparing the same and antiallergic agent containing the same | [1986/25] | French: | Dérivés du chromène, procédé pour leur préparation et compositions antiallergiques les contenant | [1986/25] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 09.12.1986 | Examination requested [1987/06] | 27.07.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.11.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.04.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.08.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.11.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.03.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.06.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 14.06.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.06.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.12.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.12.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 26.09.1990 | CH | 26.09.1990 | IT | 26.09.1990 | LI | 26.09.1990 | NL | 26.09.1990 | SE | 26.09.1990 | [1999/42] |
Former [1991/44] | AT | 26.09.1990 | |
CH | 26.09.1990 | ||
LI | 26.09.1990 | ||
NL | 26.09.1990 | ||
SE | 26.09.1990 | ||
Former [1991/42] | AT | 26.09.1990 | |
CH | 26.09.1990 | ||
LI | 26.09.1990 | ||
SE | 26.09.1990 | ||
Former [1991/33] | CH | 26.09.1990 | |
LI | 26.09.1990 | ||
SE | 26.09.1990 | ||
Former [1991/27] | SE | 26.09.1990 | Documents cited: | Search | EP0039913 [ ] (KAKEN PHARMA CO LTD [JP]) | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 93, no. 17, October 27, 1980, Columbus, Ohio, USA ISHIGURO, TOSHIHIRO; UKAWA, KIYOSHI; NOHARA, AKIRA (TAKEDA CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD.) "Coumarin derivatives" page 681, column 2, abstract-no. 168 278r | Examination | JPS54160381 | - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 93, no. 17, 27 Oct 1980, Columbus, OH (US); T.ISHIGURO et al.: "Coumarin derivatives", p. 681, no. 168278r | - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Vol. 94, No. 13, March 30, 1981, Colombus, Ohio, USA, KAKENYAKU KAKO CO., LTD., "Substituted-3-(1H-tetrazol-5-yl)-coumarins, page 748, column 2 abstract no. 103 382w | - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Vol. 93, No. 5, August 4, 1980, Colombus, Ohio, USA, ISHIGURO, TOSHIHIRO; UKAWA, KIYOSHI; NOHARA, AKIRA (TAKEDA CHEMCAL INDUSTRIES Ltd.), "3-(Tetrazol-5-yl)coumarin", page 937, column 1, abstract no. 46 684z |