EP0186829 - Method and metallic material for joining component parts together [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.06.1992 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 22.07.2009 [2009/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Asea Brown Boveri Aktiengesellschaft Kallstadter Strasse 1 68309 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/43] | For all designated states Asea Brown Boveri Aktiengesellschaft Kallstadter Strasse 1 D-68309 Mannheim / DE | ||
Former [1986/28] | For all designated states BROWN, BOVERI & CIE Aktiengesellschaft Kallstadter Strasse 1 D-68309 Mannheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jahnke, Bernd, Dr. Dipl.-Phys. Adalbert-Seifriz-Strasse 10 D-6903 Neckargemünd / DE | 02 /
Ingram, Peter, Dipl.-Chem. Wilhelm-Trübner-Strasse 13 D-6944 Hemsbach / DE | 03 /
Neidig, Arno, Dr. Dipl.-Phys. Brühlerweg 42 D-6831 Plankstadt / DE | [1986/28] | Representative(s) | Rupprecht, Klaus, et al c/o ABB Patent GmbH Postfach 10 03 51 68128 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/30] | Rupprecht, Klaus, et al c/o ABB Patent GmbH Postfach 10 03 51 68128 Mannheim / DE | ||
Former [1989/14] | Rupprecht, Klaus, Dipl.-Ing., et al c/o ABB Patent GmbH, Postfach 10 03 51 D-68128 Mannheim / DE | ||
Former [1987/13] | Kempe, Wolfgang, Dr. c/o BROWN, BOVERI & CIE AG ZPT Postfach 351 D-6800 Mannheim 31 / DE | ||
Former [1986/28] | Kempe, Wolfgang, Dr. c/o Brown, Boveri & Cie AG Postfach 351 D-6800 Mannheim 1 / DE | Application number, filing date | 85115865.9 | 12.12.1985 | [1986/28] | Priority number, date | DE19843446780 | 21.12.1984 Original published format: DE 3446780 | [1986/28] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0186829 | Date: | 09.07.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/28] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0186829 | Date: | 12.08.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0186829 | Date: | 07.08.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.06.1987 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/60, H01L23/48 | [1986/28] | CPC: |
H01L24/80 (EP,US);
H01L23/4924 (EP,US);
H01L24/29 (EP,US);
H01L24/83 (EP,US);
H01L2224/04026 (EP,US);
H01L2224/2908 (EP,US);
H01L2224/29083 (EP,US);
H01L2224/29111 (EP,US);
H01L2224/29116 (EP,US);
H01L2224/8319 (EP,US);
H01L2224/83205 (EP,US);
H01L2224/83801 (EP,US);
H01L2224/83825 (EP,US);
H01L2224/8383 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01005 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01006 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01013 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01014 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01015 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01024 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01029 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01042 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01047 (EP,US);
H01L2924/0105 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01051 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01061 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01068 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01078 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01082 (EP,US);
H01L2924/0132 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01322 (EP,US);
H01L2924/0134 (EP,US);
H01L2924/014 (EP,US);
H01L2924/157 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/29111, H01L2924/00012 (EP,US);
H01L2224/29111, H01L2924/01047, H01L2924/00014 (US,EP);
H01L2224/29111, H01L2924/01047, H01L2924/01051, H01L2924/00014 (US,EP);
H01L2224/29111, H01L2924/01082, H01L2924/00014 (EP,US);
H01L2224/29116, H01L2924/00012 (EP,US);
H01L2924/0132, H01L2924/01028, H01L2924/01047 (US,EP);
H01L2924/0132, H01L2924/01047, H01L2924/0105 (US,EP);
H01L2924/0132, H01L2924/01047, H01L2924/01082 (US,EP);
H01L2924/0132, H01L2924/0105, H01L2924/01082 (EP,US);
H01L2924/0133, H01L2924/01047, H01L2924/0105, H01L2924/01051 (EP,US); | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1986/28] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Verbindungswerkstoff zum metallischen Verbinden von Bauteilen | [1986/28] | English: | Method and metallic material for joining component parts together | [1986/28] | French: | Procédé et matériau métallique pour joindre des parties de composants | [1986/28] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 09.12.1987 | Examination requested [1988/05] | 30.01.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.08.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.09.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 21.12.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.01.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.02.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 20.02.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.05.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/31] | Request for further processing for: | 24.10.1990 | Request for further processing filed | 31.10.1990 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 20.11.1990 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.12.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.11.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.11.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 07.08.1991 | GB | 07.08.1991 | IT | 07.08.1991 | NL | 07.08.1991 | SE | 07.08.1991 | FR | 27.12.1991 | AT | 31.12.1991 | CH | 31.12.1991 | LI | 31.12.1991 | [1999/42] |
Former [1993/34] | BE | 07.08.1991 | |
GB | 07.08.1991 | ||
NL | 07.08.1991 | ||
SE | 07.08.1991 | ||
FR | 27.12.1991 | ||
AT | 31.12.1991 | ||
CH | 31.12.1991 | ||
LI | 31.12.1991 | ||
Former [1992/41] | BE | 07.08.1991 | |
GB | 07.08.1991 | ||
NL | 07.08.1991 | ||
SE | 07.08.1991 | ||
FR | 27.12.1991 | ||
CH | 31.12.1991 | ||
LI | 31.12.1991 | ||
Former [1992/34] | BE | 07.08.1991 | |
GB | 07.08.1991 | ||
NL | 07.08.1991 | ||
SE | 07.08.1991 | ||
FR | 27.12.1991 | ||
Former [1992/32] | BE | 07.08.1991 | |
NL | 07.08.1991 | ||
SE | 07.08.1991 | ||
FR | 27.12.1991 | ||
Former [1992/25] | NL | 07.08.1991 | |
SE | 07.08.1991 | ||
FR | 27.12.1991 | ||
Former [1992/13] | NL | 07.08.1991 | |
SE | 07.08.1991 | ||
Former [1992/12] | NL | 07.08.1991 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1514078 (ITT IND GMBH DEUTSCHE); | [A]FR2235752 (HONEYWELL BULL SOC IND [FR]); | [A]US3919709 (KOENIG PAUL W); | [E]EP0164537 (KLOECKNER HUMBOLDT DEUTZ AG [DE]) | [A] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, Band 24, Nr. 12, März 1982, Seiten 6430-6431, IBM, New York, US; W.R. MILLER et al.: "Disc preform for braze joining pins to substrates" |