EP0189573 - System for optical monitoring of machine positions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.05.1989 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION Westinghouse Building, Gateway Center Pittsburgh Pennsylvania 15222 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1986/32] | For all designated states WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION Westinghouse Building Gateway Center Pittsburgh Pennsylvania 15222 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Barry, Robert Francis 1318 Woodcliffe Drive Monroeville Pennsylvania 15146 / US | [1986/32] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Guido, et al Dr. Modiano & Associati SpA Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1986/32] | Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing., et al Modiano & Associati S.r.l. Via Meravigli, 16 I-20123 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 85116004.4 | 16.12.1985 | [1986/32] | Priority number, date | US19840688117 | 31.12.1984 Original published format: US 688117 | [1986/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0189573 | Date: | 06.08.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0189573 | Date: | 21.10.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.09.1987 | Classification | IPC: | G05B19/417, G01V9/04 | [1987/42] | CPC: |
B25J9/1676 (EP,US);
G05B19/4182 (EP,US);
G05B2219/49157 (EP,US);
Y02P90/02 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1986/32] | G05B19/417 | Designated contracting states | CH, GB, IT, LI, SE [1986/32] | Title | German: | Anlage zur optischen Überwachung von Werkzeugstellungen | [1986/32] | English: | System for optical monitoring of machine positions | [1986/32] | French: | Système pour la surveillance optique de positions de machines | [1986/32] | File destroyed: | 19.07.1995 | Examination procedure | 26.04.1988 | Examination requested [1988/26] | 01.08.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.12.1988 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1989/26] | 02.02.1989 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1989/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.10.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.10.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3516056 (MATTHEWS DAVID R) | [A] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, vol. 27, no. 3, August 1984, pages 1718-1720, New York, US; E.P. HECKER et al.: "Collision avoidance scheme for multiple robotic systems environments" | [A] - ELECTRONIQUE, no. 277, December 1979, pages 39-45, Paris, FR; E. CATIER: "La sécurité électronique pour éviter les accidents du travail" |