EP0186851 - Apparatus and method for composite image formation by scanning electron beam [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.07.1990 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.09.1990 [1990/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1986/28] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Finnes, Steven John 3514 - 91/2 Avenue, N.W. Rochester Minnesota 55901 / US | [1986/28] | Representative(s) | Rudack, Günter Otto IBM Corporation Säumerstrasse 4 CH-8803 Rüschlikon / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1986/28] | Rudack, Günter O., Dipl.-Ing. IBM Corporation Säumerstrasse 4 CH-8803 Rüschlikon / CH | Application number, filing date | 85116115.8 | 17.12.1985 | [1986/28] | Priority number, date | US19840687887 | 31.12.1984 Original published format: US 687887 | [1986/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0186851 | Date: | 09.07.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/28] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0186851 | Date: | 08.10.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0186851 | Date: | 04.10.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.08.1986 | Classification | IPC: | H01J37/28, H01J37/02 | [1986/28] | CPC: |
H01J37/28 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1986/28] | Title | German: | Gerät und Verfahren zur Erzeugung eines zusammengesetzten Rasterelektronenstrahlbildes | [1986/28] | English: | Apparatus and method for composite image formation by scanning electron beam | [1986/28] | French: | Appareil et méthode pour la formation d'une image composite par faisceau d'électrons balayé | [1986/28] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 29.10.1986 | Examination requested [1986/52] | 09.03.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.08.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.10.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 09.12.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.02.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.04.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.04.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 15.04.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.07.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.12.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP5778758 ; | [X]DE3404611 (HITACHI LTD [JP]); | [A]US3549999 (NORTON JAMES F) | [A] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, vol. 21, no. 8, January 1979, pages 3181-3182, Armonk, N.Y., US; A. LANZARO: "Split beam scanning electron microscope" | [A] - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 6, no. 160 (E-126)[1038], 21st August 1982; & JP - A - 57 78 758 (MITSUBISHI DENKI K.K.) 17-05-1982, & JP5778758 A 00000000 | Examination | EP0110301 |