EP0188759 - Working apparatus of pliable structure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.04.1994 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.1997 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 23.04.1997 [1997/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi Construction Machinery Co., Ltd. 6-2, Ohtemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0004 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1986/31] | For all designated states HITACHI CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY CO., LTD. 6-2, Ohtemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tokairin, Hiroaki 1828-7-405, Niihari Chiyodamura Niihari-gun Ibaraki-ken / JP | 02 /
Honma, Kazuo 3769-21, Kita Amigakko-ku Amimachi Inashiki-gun Ibaraki-ken / JP | 03 /
Nakajima, Kichio Tsukuba House 14-203 2625-3, Shimoinayoshi Chiyodamura Niihari-gun Ibaraki-ken / JP | 04 /
Nagasawa, Kiyoshi 791-23, Shimoiwasaki Kukizakimachi Inashiki-gun Ibaraki-ken / JP | 05 /
Aritake, Takeshi 213-147, Hakari Minorimachi Higashiibaraki-gun Ibaraki-ken / JP | [1986/31] | Representative(s) | Beetz & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstraße 54 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/11] | Patentanwälte Beetz - Timpe - Siegfried Schmitt-Fumian - Mayr Steinsdorfstrasse 10 D-80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1986/31] | Patentanwälte Beetz - Timpe - Siegfried Schmitt-Fumian - Mayr Steinsdorfstrasse 10 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 85116137.2 | 18.12.1985 | [1986/31] | Priority number, date | JP19840266370 | 19.12.1984 Original published format: JP 26637084 | [1986/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0188759 | Date: | 30.07.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0188759 | Date: | 28.10.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0188759 | Date: | 09.06.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.09.1987 | Classification | IPC: | B25J9/18, G05B19/42 | [1987/44] | CPC: |
B25J9/1638 (EP,US);
G05B2219/37357 (EP,US);
G05B2219/39176 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1987/42] | B25J9/18, G05B19/42 | ||
Former IPC [1986/31] | G05B19/42 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1986/31] | Title | German: | Handhabungsgerät mit beweglicher Struktur | [1986/31] | English: | Working apparatus of pliable structure | [1986/31] | French: | Appareil de manutention de structure pliable | [1986/31] | Examination procedure | 01.03.1988 | Examination requested [1988/17] | 10.11.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.05.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.08.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.12.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.08.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 04.12.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 11.12.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.03.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 03.03.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.03.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.12.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP5878205 ; | [Y]GB2102590 (CUSTOM MICRODESIGN [GB]); | [Y]EP0062076 (FANUC LTD [JP]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 7, no. 172 (P-213)[1317], 29th July 1983; & JP-A-58 78 205 (KOBE SEIKOSHO K.K.) 11-05-1983, & JP5878205 A 00000000 |