EP0226658 - Method and arrangement for optically determining surface profiles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.09.1990 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.09.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.10.1990 [1990/44] | Applicant(s) | For:DE
IBM DEUTSCHLAND GMBH Pascalstrasse 100 D-70569 Stuttgart / DE | For:FR
GB
International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1987/27] | For:DE
IBM DEUTSCHLAND GMBH Pascalstrasse 100 D-70569 Stuttgart / DE | ||
For:FR
GB
International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Makosch, Günter Stuttgarter Strasse 40 D-7032 Sindelfingen-Maichingen / DE | [1987/27] | Representative(s) | Barth, Carl Otto, et al IBM Corporation Intellectcual Property Department Säumerstrasse 4 8803 Rüschlikon / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1988/39] | Barth, Carl Otto, et al IBM Corporation Säumerstrasse 4 CH-8803 Rüschlikon / CH | ||
Former [1987/27] | Teufel, Fritz, Dipl.-Phys. IBM Deutschland Informationssysteme GmbH Patentwesen und Urheberrecht Pascalstrasse 100 W-7000 Stuttgart 80 / DE | Application number, filing date | 85116503.5 | 23.12.1985 | [1987/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0226658 | Date: | 01.07.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0226658 | Date: | 15.11.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.10.1986 | Classification | IPC: | G01B11/24, G01B11/30 | [1987/27] | CPC: |
G01B11/2441 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1987/27] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Anordnung für das optische Bestimmen von Oberflächenprofilen | [1987/27] | English: | Method and arrangement for optically determining surface profiles | [1987/27] | French: | Méthode et disposition pour la détermination optique de profilés de surfaces | [1987/27] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 23.10.1987 | Examination requested [1987/52] | 27.01.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.05.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.06.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 22.06.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.08.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.12.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2109545 (DOWNS MICHAEL JOHN); | [A]EP0011708 (IBM [US]); | [A]EP0148285 ; | [A]US4316670 (CORWIN RICHARD R, et al); | [A]US4353650 (SOMMARGREN GARY E) | [AD] - APPLIED OPTICS, vol. 22, no. 12, 15th June 1983, pages 1893-1897, Optical Society of America, New York, US; K. ALMARZOUK: "Three-beam interferometric profilometer" |