EP0190462 - Animal feed block compositions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 17.05.1993 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AMERICAN CYANAMID COMPANY 1937 West Main Street P.O. Box 60 Stamford Connecticut 06904-0060 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1986/33] | For all designated states AMERICAN CYANAMID COMPANY 1937 West Main Street P.O. Box 60 Stamford Connecticut 06904-0060 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Parker, Lawrence David c/o American Cyanamid Co. 1937 West Main Street P.O. Box 60 Stamford Conn. 06904 / GB | 02 /
English, Adrian Marcus 25 Martello Close Gosport Hampshire / GB | [1989/28] |
Former [1986/38] | 01 /
Parker, Lawrence David c/o American Cyanamid Co. 1937 West Main Street Stubbington Hampshire / GB | ||
02 /
English, Adrian Maveus 25 Martello Close Gosport Hampshire / GB | |||
Former [1986/33] | 01 /
Parker, Lawrence David 111 Crofton Lane Stubbington Hampshire / GB | ||
02 /
English, Adrian Maveus 25 Martello Close Gosport Hampshire / GB | Representative(s) | Wächtershäuser, Günter Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwälte Ottostrasse 4 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/33] | Wächtershäuser, Günter, Prof. Dr. Patentanwalt, Tal 29 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 85116601.7 | 27.12.1985 | [1986/33] | Priority number, date | GB19850000385 | 08.01.1985 Original published format: GB 8500385 | [1986/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0190462 | Date: | 13.08.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/33] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0190462 | Date: | 26.04.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.03.1989 | Classification | IPC: | A23K1/17, A23K1/175 | [1989/17] | CPC: |
A23K40/20 (EP,US);
A23K20/163 (US);
A23K20/195 (EP);
A61P3/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1986/33] | A23K1/16 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/33] | Title | German: | Leckstein-Zusammensetzungen für Tiere | [1986/33] | English: | Animal feed block compositions | [1986/33] | French: | Compositions de blocs de sel pour les animaux | [1986/33] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 16.10.1989 | Examination requested [1989/50] | 12.11.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.05.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.08.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.01.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.02.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.06.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.08.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 10.02.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1993/27] | 20.02.1993 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1993/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.09.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.09.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.11.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.1992 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3832462 (SHU P, et al); | [A]FR2409012 (HENKEL KGAA [DE]); | [A]EP0063491 (LILLY CO ELI [US]); | [A]DE1767852 ; | [A]DE2040375 (MCKENZIE CARL OLEN); | [AD]US3856937 (WAITE J) |