EP0152122 - Compact shearing machine with scrap shears [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 26.11.1993 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DANIELI & C. OFFICINE MECCANICHE S.p.A. Via Nazionale, 19 33042 Buttrio (UD) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1985/34] | For all designated states DANIELI & C. OFFICINE MECCANICHE S.p.A. Via Nazionale, 19 I-33042 Buttrio (UD) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fuccaro, Giorgio Via Fruc, 73 I-33100 Udine / IT | [1985/34] | Representative(s) | Petraz, Gilberto Luigi, et al GLP S.r.l. Viale Europa Unita, 171 33100 Udine / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1985/34] | Petraz, Gilberto Luigi, et al GLP S.r.l. Piazzale Cavedalis 6/2 I-33100 Udine / IT | Application number, filing date | 85200004.1 | 02.01.1985 | [1985/34] | Priority number, date | IT19840083311 | 27.01.1984 Original published format: IT 8331184 | [1985/34] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0152122 | Date: | 21.08.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0152122 | Date: | 27.12.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0152122 | Date: | 04.04.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/14] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0152122 | Date: | 12.01.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.10.1985 | Classification | IPC: | B23D25/14, B23D31/04 | [1985/34] | CPC: |
B23D25/14 (EP,US);
B23D31/04 (EP,US);
Y10S83/923 (EP,US);
Y10T83/2211 (EP,US);
Y10T83/4662 (EP,US);
Y10T83/4705 (EP,US);
Y10T83/4714 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, LU, NL, SE [1985/34] | Title | German: | Kompakte Schere mit Abfallschere | [1985/34] | English: | Compact shearing machine with scrap shears | [1985/34] | French: | Dispositif de coupe compact, avec cisaille déchiqueteuse | [1985/34] | Examination procedure | 10.03.1986 | Examination requested [1986/38] | 12.10.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.01.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.10.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.12.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.04.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.08.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.10.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 06.10.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
04.01.1991
21.03.1991
ADMISSIBLE SMS Schloemann-Siemag AG Eduard-Schloemann-Strasse 4 D-40237 Düsseldorf / DE Opponent's representative Müller, Gerd Patentanwälte HEMMERICH-MÜLLER-GROSSE-POLLMEIER-MEY Hammerstrasse 2 D-57072 Siegen / DE | [1991/09] | 28.03.1991 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 08.06.1991 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 17.06.1991 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04) | 16.10.1991 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 20.03.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M06) | 07.08.1992 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 29.01.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02) | 08.03.1993 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 04.05.1993 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 15.05.1993 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 16.08.1993 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 09.11.1993 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.12.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.12.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 04.04.1990 | CH | 04.04.1990 | LI | 04.04.1990 | NL | 04.04.1990 | SE | 04.04.1990 | LU | 31.01.1991 | [1999/52] |
Former [1991/23] | BE | 04.04.1990 | |
CH | 04.04.1990 | ||
LI | 04.04.1990 | ||
NL | 04.04.1990 | ||
SE | 04.04.1990 | ||
Former [1991/17] | CH | 04.04.1990 | |
LI | 04.04.1990 | ||
NL | 04.04.1990 | ||
SE | 04.04.1990 | ||
Former [1990/50] | CH | 04.04.1990 | |
LI | 04.04.1990 | ||
SE | 04.04.1990 | ||
Former [1990/46] | CH | 04.04.1990 | |
LI | 04.04.1990 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]GB472797 (SCHLOEMANN AG); | [AD]DE1125259 (JUNKER FA O); | [AD]FR1355123 (MORGARDSHAMMARS MEK VERKST SA); | [AD]FR2134897 (BRISSONNEAU & LOTZ); | [AD]DE2720136 (DEMAG AG) |