EP0152143 - Reciprocating drive assembly for shearfoil razor with singlephase synchronous motor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.04.1990 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.04.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.05.1990 [1990/21] | Applicant(s) | For:DE
Philips Corporate Intellectual Property GmbH Habsburgerallee 11 52064 Aachen / DE | For:FR
GB
AT
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1985/34] | For:DE
Philips Patentverwaltung GmbH Röntgenstrasse 24 D-22335 Hamburg / DE | ||
For:FR
GB
AT
Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Diefenbach, Gerhard Schulstrasse 19 D-5100 Aachen / DE | 02 /
Schemmann, Hugo, Dr. Zwartebergweg 6 NL-6371 XD Schaesberg / NL | 03 /
Bukoschek, Romuald Leander Dr.-Palla-Gasse 28 A-9020 Klagenfurt / AT | [1985/34] | Representative(s) | Kupfermann, Fritz-Joachim, et al Philips Patentverwaltung GmbH Postfach 10 51 49 20035 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/34] | Kupfermann, Fritz-Joachim, Dipl.-Ing., et al Philips Patentverwaltung GmbH Postfach 10 51 49 D-20035 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 85200138.7 | 07.02.1985 | [1985/34] | Priority number, date | DE19843404296 | 08.02.1984 Original published format: DE 3404296 | [1985/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0152143 | Date: | 21.08.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0152143 | Date: | 28.05.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0152143 | Date: | 17.05.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.04.1986 | Classification | IPC: | B26B19/28 | [1985/34] | CPC: |
B26B19/282 (EP,US);
B26B19/28 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB [1985/34] | Title | German: | Antriebsvorrichtung für einen Vibrationstrockenrasierapparat mit einer Scherfolie und einem hin und her bewegbaren Schneidelement und Antrieb durch einen Einphasensynchronmotor | [1985/34] | English: | Reciprocating drive assembly for shearfoil razor with singlephase synchronous motor | [1985/34] | French: | Système d'entraînement à mouvement de "va-et-vient" pour rasoir électrique à feuille perforée équipé d'un moteur synchrone mono-phase | [1985/34] | Examination procedure | 16.10.1986 | Examination requested [1986/50] | 25.03.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.05.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.07.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.11.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.02.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 13.02.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.02.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.02.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.02.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.02.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1043867 (SIEMENS AG); | [Y]DE1268465 (IBM DEUTSCHLAND); | [A]US3857296 (TSUNODA K); | [YD]EP0045107 (PHILIPS NV [NL]) |