EP0152987 - Device comprising a frame of lengths of tube and coupling pieces and coupling piece for the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.06.1989 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 20.08.2008 [2008/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Keen, Egbert Folgeren 12 NL-9207 AB Drachten / NL | [1985/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1985/35] | Representative(s) | 't Jong, Bastiaan Jacobus, et al Arnold & Siedsma Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK The Hague / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | 't Jong, Bastiaan Jacobus, et al Arnold & Siedsma Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK The Hague / NL | ||
Former [1985/35] | 't Jong, Bastiaan Jacobus, et al Arnold & Siedsma, Advocaten en Octrooigemachtigden, Sweelinckplein 1 NL-2517 GK Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 85200196.5 | 15.02.1985 | [1985/35] | Priority number, date | NL19840000519 | 17.02.1984 Original published format: NL 8400519 | [1985/35] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0152987 | Date: | 28.08.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0152987 | Date: | 24.08.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.07.1985 | Classification | IPC: | F16B12/40, F16B7/04, A47B3/00 | [1985/35] | CPC: |
A47B47/0008 (EP,US);
A47B2220/11 (EP,US);
A47B2230/01 (EP,US);
F16B2012/446 (EP,US);
F16B2200/67 (EP,US);
Y10T403/341 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1985/35] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung bestehend aus einem Rahmen aus Rohrstücken und Verbinder und die Verbinder dafür | [1985/35] | English: | Device comprising a frame of lengths of tube and coupling pieces and coupling piece for the same | [1985/35] | French: | Dispositif comprenant une ossature tubulaire et des pièces d'assemblage et pièce d'assemblage adéquate | [1985/35] | Examination procedure | 28.02.1986 | Examination requested [1986/19] | 20.05.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.09.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.12.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.02.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.03.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 08.03.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.05.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.02.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CH436610 (CONTRAVES AG [CH]); | [XD]FR2262217 (GUILLAUMOND GABRIEL [FR]); | [A]GB1497403 (SLOGGETT C); | [A]DE3142283 (MOLL REINER [DE]) |