EP0155715 - Electrically heated device comprising a heating cable and a safety circuit against excess heat [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.08.1990 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 31.10.2007 [2007/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Fabriek Inventum Fabriek van Instrumenten en Electrische Apparaten N.V. Leijenseweg 101 P.O. Box 4 3720 AA Bilthoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1985/39] | For all designated states Koninklijke Fabriek Inventum Fabriek van Instrumenten en Electrische Apparaten N.V. Leijenseweg 101 P.O. Box 4 NL-3720 AA Bilthoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
van der Wansem, Pieter Johan Nassaulaan 31 NL-3761 BS Soest / NL | [1985/39] | Representative(s) | Noz, Franciscus Xaverius, et al P. Petersstraat 160, P.O. Box 645 5600 AP Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1985/39] | Noz, Franciscus Xaverius, Ir., et al P. Petersstraat 160, P.O. Box 645 NL-5600 AP Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 85200202.1 | 16.02.1985 | [1985/39] | Priority number, date | NL19840000920 | 23.03.1984 Original published format: NL 8400920 | [1985/39] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0155715 | Date: | 25.09.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0155715 | Date: | 08.11.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.07.1985 | Classification | IPC: | H02H5/04, H05B3/34 | [1985/39] | CPC: |
H02H5/043 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1985/39] | Title | German: | Elektrisch geheizte Einrichtung, die ein Heizkabel und einen Sicherheitskreis gegen Überhitzung beinhaltet | [1985/39] | English: | Electrically heated device comprising a heating cable and a safety circuit against excess heat | [1985/39] | French: | Dispositif chauffé électriquement comprenant un câble chauffant et un circuit de sécurité contre la surchauffe | [1985/39] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 28.02.1986 | Examination requested [1986/19] | 03.02.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.06.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.05.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.08.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 04.08.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.08.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.12.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.12.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.11.1989 | BE | 08.11.1989 | CH | 08.11.1989 | FR | 08.11.1989 | IT | 08.11.1989 | LI | 08.11.1989 | NL | 08.11.1989 | SE | 08.11.1989 | GB | 16.02.1990 | LU | 28.02.1990 | [2002/24] |
Former [1999/52] | AT | 08.11.1989 | |
BE | 08.11.1989 | ||
CH | 08.11.1989 | ||
IT | 08.11.1989 | ||
LI | 08.11.1989 | ||
NL | 08.11.1989 | ||
SE | 08.11.1989 | ||
GB | 16.02.1990 | ||
LU | 28.02.1990 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 08.11.1989 | |
BE | 08.11.1989 | ||
CH | 08.11.1989 | ||
IT | 08.11.1989 | ||
LI | 08.11.1989 | ||
NL | 08.11.1989 | ||
SE | 08.11.1989 | ||
GB | 16.02.1990 | ||
Former [1991/14] | AT | 08.11.1989 | |
BE | 08.11.1989 | ||
CH | 08.11.1989 | ||
LI | 08.11.1989 | ||
NL | 08.11.1989 | ||
SE | 08.11.1989 | ||
GB | 16.02.1990 | ||
Former [1991/11] | AT | 08.11.1989 | |
CH | 08.11.1989 | ||
LI | 08.11.1989 | ||
NL | 08.11.1989 | ||
SE | 08.11.1989 | ||
GB | 16.02.1990 | ||
Former [1990/42] | AT | 08.11.1989 | |
CH | 08.11.1989 | ||
LI | 08.11.1989 | ||
NL | 08.11.1989 | ||
SE | 08.11.1989 | ||
Former [1990/29] | CH | 08.11.1989 | |
LI | 08.11.1989 | ||
NL | 08.11.1989 | ||
SE | 08.11.1989 | ||
Former [1990/28] | CH | 08.11.1989 | |
LI | 08.11.1989 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2028608 (DREAMLAND ELECTRICAL APPLIANCE); | [AD]GB2028607 (DREAMLAND ELECTRICAL APPLIANCE); | [A]GB2056204 (RAYCHEM CORP); | [X]GB2086676 (SUNBEAM CORP) |