EP0152992 - Rubber-reinforced polymeric resins containing a mineral fiber [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.10.1988 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.10.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.12.1988 [1988/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Dow Chemical Company 2020 Dow Center Midland, Michigan 48674 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1985/35] | For all designated states THE DOW CHEMICAL COMPANY 2030 Dow Center Abbott Road P.O. Box 1967 Midland Michigan 48640-1967 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Van, Dinh Phan Spinmolenplein 246 B-9000 Gent / BE | [1985/35] | Representative(s) | Urbanus, Henricus Maria, et al c/o Vereenigde Octrooibureaux Nieuwe Parklaan 107 2587 BP 's-Gravenhage / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1985/35] | Urbanus, Henricus Maria, Ir., et al c/o Vereenigde Octrooibureaux Nieuwe Parklaan 107 NL-2587 BP 's-Gravenhage / NL | Application number, filing date | 85200231.0 | 20.02.1985 | [1985/35] | Priority number, date | NL19840000549 | 21.02.1984 Original published format: NL 8400549 | [1985/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0152992 | Date: | 28.08.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0152992 | Date: | 23.12.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.07.1985 | Classification | IPC: | C08K7/14, C08K3/40, C08L51/04, C08L55/02, C08L25/12 | [1985/35] | CPC: |
C08K7/14 (EP,US);
C08L55/02 (KR)
| C-Set: |
C08K7/14, C08L51/04 (EP,US);
C08K7/14, C08L55/02 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1985/35] | Title | German: | Mit Gummi verstärkte, anorganiche Fasern enthaltende Polymerharze | [1985/35] | English: | Rubber-reinforced polymeric resins containing a mineral fiber | [1985/35] | French: | Résines polymères renforcées par du caoutchouc contenant une fibre minérale | [1985/35] | Examination procedure | 10.10.1985 | Examination requested [1985/51] | 15.07.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.11.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.02.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 26.05.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.08.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 27.08.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.09.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.12.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1501419 (BAYER AG); | [A]FR2197916 (UNIROYAL INC [US]) |