EP0154379 - Improved array arrangement for EEPROMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.09.1992 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.1997 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 23.04.1997 [1997/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1985/37] | For all designated states Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fang, Sheng c/o INT. OCTROOIBUREAU B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [1985/37] | Representative(s) | Faessen, Louis Marie Hubertus, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1985/37] | Faessen, Louis Marie Hubertus, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 85200288.0 | 28.02.1985 | [1985/37] | Priority number, date | US19840585319 | 01.03.1984 Original published format: US 585319 | [1985/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0154379 | Date: | 11.09.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0154379 | Date: | 16.09.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0154379 | Date: | 21.11.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.07.1987 | Classification | IPC: | G11C16/06 | [1991/47] | CPC: |
G11C16/10 (EP,US);
G11C16/28 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1985/37] | G11C17/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1985/37] | Title | German: | Feldanordnung für EEPROMS | [1985/37] | English: | Improved array arrangement for EEPROMS | [1985/37] | French: | Arrangement de réseau pour des EEPROMS | [1985/37] | Examination procedure | 15.03.1988 | Examination requested [1988/19] | 10.01.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.05.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.06.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.09.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.10.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.03.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.06.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 12.06.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.08.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.02.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.02.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.02.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.02.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.02.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4090258 (CRICCHI JAMES R); | [A]US4266283 (PERLEGOS GEORGE, et al); | [A]EP0050005 (TOKYO SHIBAURA ELECTRIC CO [JP]) |