EP0155049 - Transmission system for the transmission of data signals in a modulation band [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.08.1990 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.09.1990 [1990/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1985/38] | For all designated states Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Claasen, Theodoor Antonius C. M. c/o INT. OCTROOIBUREAU B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
Beenker, Gerardus Franciscus M. c/o INT. OCTROOIBUREAU B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
van Gerwen, Petrus Josephus c/o INT. OCTROOIBUREAU B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 04 /
Meijer, Johannes Maria c/o INT. OCTROOIBUREAU B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 05 /
Didden, Martinus Lambertus N. c/o INT. OCTROOIBUREAU B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [1985/38] | Representative(s) | de Jongh, Cornelis Dominicus, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1985/38] | De Jongh, Cornelis Dominicus, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 85200296.3 | 28.02.1985 | [1985/38] | Priority number, date | NL19840000677 | 02.03.1984 Original published format: NL 8400677 | [1985/38] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0155049 | Date: | 18.09.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0155049 | Date: | 11.10.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.07.1985 | Classification | IPC: | H04L27/00, H04L25/49, H04L25/03 | [1985/38] | CPC: |
H04B1/62 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1985/38] | Title | German: | System zur Übertragung von Datensignalen in einem Modulationsband | [1985/38] | English: | Transmission system for the transmission of data signals in a modulation band | [1985/38] | French: | Système de transmission de signaux de données dans une bande de modulation | [1985/38] | Examination procedure | 17.03.1986 | Examination requested [1986/21] | 28.10.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.05.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.09.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.04.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.07.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 10.07.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.07.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/38] | Request for further processing for: | 20.05.1988 | Request for further processing filed | 20.05.1988 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 13.07.1988 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.02.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.02.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.02.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 11.10.1989 | LI | 11.10.1989 | NL | 11.10.1989 | [1990/27] |
Former [1990/18] | CH | 11.10.1989 | |
LI | 11.10.1989 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP58007935 ; | [A]DE2020805 (SIEMENS AG); | [A]US4121295 (WITT RICHARD P); | [A]GB2034146 (KOKUSAI DENSHIN DENWA CO LTD) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 7, no. 80, (E-168) [1225], April 2, 1983; & JP-A-58 007 935 KOKUSAI DENSHIN DENWA K.K.) 17-01-1983, & JP58007935 A 00000000 | Examination | JP587935 | - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 7, no. 80, (E-168) [1225], April 2, 1983, & JP - A - 58 79 35 KOKUSAI DENSHIN DENWA K.K.) 17-01-1983, & JP587935 A 00000000 |