EP0158382 - An apparatus for slit radiography [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.04.1989 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.04.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.05.1989 [1989/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states B.V. Optische Industrie "De Oude Delft" Postbus 72 2600 MD Delft / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1988/08] | For all designated states B.V. Optische Industrie "De Oude Delft" Van Miereveltlaan 9 NL-2612 XE Delft / NL | ||
Former [1985/42] | For all designated states N.V. Optische Industrie "De Oude Delft" Van Miereveltlaan 9 NL-2612 XE Delft / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vlasbloem, Hugo Burgemeester v.d. Lelykade 4 3155 AB Maasland / NL | 02 /
Duinker, Simon Mollaan 1 2061 CR Bloemendaal / NL | [1985/42] | Representative(s) | Smulders, Theodorus A.H.J., et al Vereenigde Postbus 87930 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1988/14] | Smulders, Theodorus A.H.J., Ir., et al Vereenigde Octrooibureaux Nieuwe Parklaan 97 NL-2587 BN 's-Gravenhage / NL | ||
Former [1985/42] | Urbanus, Henricus Maria, Ir. c/o Vereenigde Octrooibureaux Nieuwe Parklaan 107 NL-2587 BP 's-Gravenhage / NL | Application number, filing date | 85200377.1 | 14.03.1985 | [1985/42] | Priority number, date | NL19840000845 | 16.03.1984 Original published format: NL 8400845 | [1985/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0158382 | Date: | 16.10.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0158382 | Date: | 08.06.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.08.1985 | Classification | IPC: | G21K1/04, H05G1/60, H05G1/64, H05G1/36, A61B6/06 | [1985/42] | CPC: |
A61B6/032 (EP,US);
A61B6/06 (EP,US);
A61B6/4035 (EP,US);
G21K1/04 (EP,US);
G21K1/043 (EP,US);
H05G1/36 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1985/42] | Title | German: | Röntgenaufnahmegerät mit Schlitzblenden | [1985/42] | English: | An apparatus for slit radiography | [1985/42] | French: | Appareil de radiographie par diaphragme à fente | [1985/42] | Examination procedure | 17.01.1986 | Examination requested [1986/12] | 28.01.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.05.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.10.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 23.10.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 30.10.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.02.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 02.02.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.03.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2943205 (BENJAMIN KAZAN, et al); | [A]DE2351473 (PHILIPS PATENTVERWALTUNG); | [A]US3912936 (CUNNINGHAME ANDREW LEES, et al); | [A]DE2732073 (TOKYO SHIBAURA ELECTRIC CO); | [A]DE2814242 ; | [A]WO8201124 (DIAGNOSTIC INFORM [US]); | [A]EP0083465 (PHILIPS CORP [US]) | Examination | US3755672 |