EP0156440 - An information transmission method with error correction for user words, an error correcting decoding method for such user words, an apparatus for information transmission for use with the method, a device for information decoding for use with the method and an apparatus for use with such device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.11.1990 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.01.1991 [1991/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1985/40] | For all designated states Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Suzuki, Tadao c/o INT. OCTROOIBUREAU B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
Sako, Yoichiro c/o INT. OCTROOIBUREAU B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
Furukawa, Shunske c/o INT. OCTROOIBUREAU B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 04 /
Furuya, Tsuneo c/o INT. OCTROOIBUREAU B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 05 /
Baggen, Constant Paul Marie Jozef c/o INT. OCTROOIBUREAU B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [1985/40] | Representative(s) | Strijland, Wilfred, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1985/40] | Strijland, Wilfred, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 85200431.6 | 20.03.1985 | [1985/40] | Priority number, date | JP19840057595 | 24.03.1984 Original published format: JP 5759584 | JP19840057596 | 24.03.1984 Original published format: JP 5759684 | [1985/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0156440 | Date: | 02.10.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0156440 | Date: | 30.12.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0156440 | Date: | 24.01.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.11.1986 | Classification | IPC: | H03M13/00, H03M13/22, // G11B20/18, G06F11/10 | [1985/40] | CPC: |
H03M13/2703 (EP,US);
G11B20/1809 (EP,US);
G11B27/3063 (EP,US);
H03M13/29 (EP,US);
H03M13/2921 (EP,US);
H03M13/35 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, IT, LI, NL, SE [1985/40] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Informationsübertragung mit Fehlerkorrektur für Datenworte, ein Fehlerkorrektur-Dekodierverfahren für solche Datenworte, eine Anordnung zur Informationsübertragung zur Verwendung mit dem Verfahren, ein Gerät für Informationsdekodierung zur Verwendung mit dem Verfahren und eine Anordnung zur Verwendung mit solchem Gerät | [1985/40] | English: | An information transmission method with error correction for user words, an error correcting decoding method for such user words, an apparatus for information transmission for use with the method, a device for information decoding for use with the method and an apparatus for use with such device | [1985/40] | French: | Méthode de transmission d'information avec correction d'erreurs des mots de données, méthode de décodage de correction d'erreurs pour les mots de données, un appareil de transmission d'information utilisant cette méthode, un appareil pour décoder l'information utilisant cette méthode et un dispositif utilisant un tel appareil | [1985/40] | Examination procedure | 15.05.1987 | Examination requested [1987/29] | 03.05.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 06.07.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 19.07.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.10.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 17.10.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.10.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP58168346 ; | [A]WO8301334 (DIGITAL EQUIPMENT CORP [US]); | [A]EP0074644 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) | [A] - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 7, no. 292 (E-219)[1437], 27th December 1983; & JP-A-58 168 346 (SONY K.K.) 04-10-1983, & JP58168346 A 00000000 | [A] - ELECTRONICS & COMMUNICATIONS IN JAPAN, vol. 64, no. 5, May 1981, pages 20-30, Scripta Publishing Co., Silver Spring, Maryland, US; M. OHKUBO et al.: "On interleaved codes for error-correcting codes" | [A] - JOURNAL OF THE AUDIO ENGINEERING SOCIETY, vol. 27, no. 12, December 1979, pages 975-981, New York, US; T.T. DOI et al.: "A long-play digital audio disk system" | [A] - ELECTRONIC COMPONENTS AND APPLICATIONS, vol. 4, no. 3, May 1982, pages 131-141, Eindhoven, NL; J. MATULL: "ICs for compact disc decoders" | [XP] - ELECTRONICS INTERNATIONAL, vol. 57, no. 8, April 1984, pages 85,86, New York, US; C.L. COHEN: "Laser disks may be used as computer ROMs" |