Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU570548B | Global Dossier | 17.03.1988 | B2 | AU4072185 | 17.10.1985 | A | Priority number | Date | FR8405639 | 10.04.1984 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0159075 | Global Dossier | 02.03.1988 | B1 | EP0159075 | 23.10.1985 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR8405639 | 10.04.1984 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR8501530 | 26.11.1985 | A | Priority number | Date | FR8405639 | 10.04.1984 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA1227570 | 29.09.1987 | A | Priority number | Date | FR8405639 | 10.04.1984 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3561776D1 | 07.04.1988 | D1 | Priority number | Date | FR8405639 | 10.04.1984 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | FR2562704 | 08.08.1986 | B1 | FR2562704 | 11.10.1985 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR8405639 | 10.04.1984 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPS60219688 | 02.11.1985 | A | Priority number | Date | FR8405639 | 10.04.1984 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4723179 | 02.02.1988 | A | Priority number | Date | FR8405639 | 10.04.1984 |