EP0165627 - Robot carrier structure with carriage movable on rails [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.01.1990 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.04.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 12.06.2002 [2002/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BISIACH & CARRU' S.p.A. Corso Lombardia, 21 I-10078 Venaria (Turin) / IT | [1985/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bisiach, Luciano Strada Comunale San Vito-Revigliasco 350 I-10133 Turin / IT | [1985/52] | Representative(s) | Robba, Eugenio Studio "INTERPATENT" via Caboto 35 10129 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1985/52] | Robba, Eugenio Studio "INTERPATENT" via Caboto 35 I-10129 Turin / IT | Application number, filing date | 85200756.6 | 13.05.1985 | [1985/52] | Priority number, date | IT19840067630 | 19.06.1984 Original published format: IT 6763084 | [1985/52] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0165627 | Date: | 27.12.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0165627 | Date: | 15.01.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0165627 | Date: | 29.03.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.11.1985 | Classification | IPC: | B25J5/02 | [1985/52] | CPC: |
B25J5/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, LU, NL, SE [1985/52] | Title | German: | Robotersystem mit auf Schienen zu bewegendem Wagen | [1985/52] | English: | Robot carrier structure with carriage movable on rails | [1985/52] | French: | Structure robotique utilisant un chariot mobile sur rails | [1985/52] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 26.06.1986 | Examination requested [1986/36] | 25.08.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.12.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.04.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.05.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.08.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.09.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.10.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 17.10.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.12.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.04.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 29.03.1989 | BE | 29.03.1989 | CH | 29.03.1989 | FR | 29.03.1989 | LI | 29.03.1989 | NL | 29.03.1989 | SE | 29.03.1989 | LU | 31.05.1989 | [2002/24] |
Former [1999/52] | AT | 29.03.1989 | |
BE | 29.03.1989 | ||
CH | 29.03.1989 | ||
LI | 29.03.1989 | ||
NL | 29.03.1989 | ||
SE | 29.03.1989 | ||
LU | 31.05.1989 | ||
Former [1990/10] | AT | 29.03.1989 | |
CH | 29.03.1989 | ||
LI | 29.03.1989 | ||
NL | 29.03.1989 | ||
SE | 29.03.1989 | ||
BE | 31.05.1989 | ||
Former [1990/09] | AT | 29.03.1989 | |
CH | 29.03.1989 | ||
LI | 29.03.1989 | ||
SE | 29.03.1989 | ||
BE | 31.05.1989 | ||
Former [1990/05] | CH | 29.03.1989 | |
LI | 29.03.1989 | ||
SE | 29.03.1989 | ||
BE | 31.05.1989 | ||
Former [1989/39] | SE | 29.03.1989 | |
BE | 31.05.1989 | ||
Former [1989/36] | SE | 29.03.1989 | Documents cited: | Search | DD119770 [ ]; | FR2334477 [ ] (MASCHF AUGSBURG NUERNBERG AG [DE]); | DE3141724 [ ] (WINDHOFF RHEINER MASCHF [DE]); | FR2527965 [ ] (IND [FR]); | AT373436B [ ] (KRAFTWERK UNION AG [DE]) | Examination | EP0098738 |