EP0161728 - Bogie system for a rail vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.06.1989 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.06.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.07.1989 [1989/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RMO-Werkspoor Services B.V. 62, Oostenburgermiddenstraat NL-1018 MS Amsterdam / NL | [1985/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Keizer, Cornelis Pieter C. de Bourbonlaan 43 NL-3136 CL Vlaardingen / NL | 02 /
Zeevenhoven, Nikolaas H.C.E. Gezichtslaan 14 NL-3723 GE Bilthoven / NL | [1985/47] | Representative(s) | Konings, Lucien Marie Cornelis J., et al Arnold & Siedsma, Advocaten en Octrooigemachtigden, Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1985/47] | Konings, Lucien Marie Cornelis Joseph, et al Arnold & Siedsma, Advocaten en Octrooigemachtigden, Sweelinckplein 1 NL-2517 GK Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 85200768.1 | 14.05.1985 | [1985/47] | Priority number, date | NL19840001549 | 14.05.1984 Original published format: NL 8401549 | [1985/47] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0161728 | Date: | 21.11.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0161728 | Date: | 10.08.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.09.1985 | Classification | IPC: | B61F5/42 | [1985/47] | CPC: |
B61F5/42 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1985/47] | Title | German: | Laufwerksanlage für Schienenfahrzeuge | [1985/47] | English: | Bogie system for a rail vehicle | [1985/47] | French: | Système d'essieux pour un véhicule ferroviaire | [1985/47] | Examination procedure | 06.02.1986 | Examination requested [1986/15] | 14.10.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.11.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.07.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 09.11.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.12.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 04.12.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.06.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1153641 (TALGO PATENTES); | [A]US2908233 (FURRER JOHN R); | [A]DE1102795 (ESSLINGEN MASCHF); | [A]US3249066 (MARTIN FERNANDEZ-HEREDIA FRANC); | [A]DE1236348 (LINKE HOFMANN BUSCH); | [A]US3354836 (DONALD WILLISON, et al) |