EP0168859 - Heat dissipation device for an electrical component [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.02.1990 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1986/04] | For all designated states Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Veerman, Frederik Wilhelm Johan c/o INT. OCTROOIBUREAU B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [1986/04] | Representative(s) | Cuppens, Hubertus Martinus Maria, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1986/04] | Cuppens, Hubertus Martinus Maria, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 85200937.2 | 14.06.1985 | [1986/04] | Priority number, date | NL19840001921 | 18.06.1984 Original published format: NL 8401921 | [1986/04] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0168859 | Date: | 22.01.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0168859 | Date: | 19.04.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.1985 | Classification | IPC: | H05K7/20 | [1986/04] | CPC: |
H05K7/20445 (EP);
H01L2924/0002 (EP)
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1986/04] | Title | German: | Wärmeabführeinrichtung für eine elektrische Komponente | [1986/04] | English: | Heat dissipation device for an electrical component | [1986/04] | French: | Moyen de dissipation de la chaleur d'un composant électrique | [1986/04] | Examination procedure | 11.06.1986 | Examination requested [1986/33] | 18.03.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.10.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.01.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 12.01.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.01.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/14] | Request for further processing for: | 23.09.1988 | Request for further processing filed | 23.09.1988 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.10.1988 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.06.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.07.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.07.1988 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   13.07.1988 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | |||
Former [1989/39] | BE | 30.06.1989 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2336878 ; | [A]US3129282 (FLYNN GORDON L) | [A] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, vol. 19, no. 5, Octobre 1976, page 1802, New York, US; O.J. CAIN et al.: "Semiconductor module with improved air cooling" | [A] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCOSURE BULLETIN, vol. 19, no. 7, December 1976, page 2652, New York, US; J.H. CIANCANELLI: "Circuit module iwth heat transfer" |