EP0168871 - Pulling with reversing device and process for circular knitting frames [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.10.1989 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.10.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.12.1989 [1989/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SAVIO S.p.A. Via Udine 105 I-33170 Pordenone / IT | [1988/47] |
Former [1986/04] | For all designated states Officine Savio S.p.A. Via Udine 105 I-33170 Pordenone / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Beconcini, Paolo Via R. Zandonai 16 I-50127 Florence / IT | 02 /
Caccivio, Giuseppe Via Pisana 519/D I-50018 Scandicci Florence / IT | 03 /
Nannini, Dante Via F.lli Cervi 22 I-50064 Incisa Val D'Arno Florence / IT | [1986/04] | Representative(s) | Roggero, Sergio, et al Ing. Barzanò & Zanardo Milano S.p.A. Via Borgonuovo 10 I-20121 Milano / IT | [1986/04] | Application number, filing date | 85201009.9 | 26.06.1985 | [1986/04] | Priority number, date | IT19840021654 | 29.06.1984 Original published format: IT 2165484 | [1986/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0168871 | Date: | 22.01.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0168871 | Date: | 14.12.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/50] | Type: | B1 RE Reissue of patent specification | No.: | EP0168871 | Date: | 03.02.1989 | [1989/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.11.1985 | Classification | IPC: | D04B15/92 | [1986/04] | CPC: |
D04B15/92 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1986/04] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum Abziehen und Wenden für Rundstrickmaschinen | [1986/04] | English: | Pulling with reversing device and process for circular knitting frames | [1986/04] | French: | Dispositif et procédé de tirage et de retournement pour métier à tricoter circulaire | [1986/04] | Examination procedure | 07.04.1986 | Examination requested [1986/25] | 22.07.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.11.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.03.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.04.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.05.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 05.05.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.09.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.05.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.05.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2709352 (LAWSON ROBERT H); | [A]BE654671 ; | [A]FR1412180 (SOLIS SOC A R L); | [AD]GB2001112 (LONATI COST MECC) |