EP0169598 - Ventilation panel for electromagnetic shielding [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.07.1989 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.09.1989 [1989/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1986/05] | For all designated states Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Veerman, Frederik Wilhelm Johan c/o INT. OCTROOIBUREAU B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
Jonker, Jan Hilco c/o INT. OCTROOIBUREAU B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [1986/05] | Representative(s) | Cuppens, Hubertus Martinus Maria, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1986/05] | Cuppens, Hubertus Martinus Maria, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 85201069.3 | 03.07.1985 | [1986/05] | Priority number, date | NL19840002224 | 13.07.1984 Original published format: NL 8402224 | [1986/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0169598 | Date: | 29.01.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0169598 | Date: | 21.09.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.11.1985 | Classification | IPC: | H05K9/00 | [1986/05] | CPC: |
H05K9/00 (EP,US);
H05K9/0041 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1986/05] | Title | German: | Lüftungsplatte für elektromagnetische Abschirmung | [1986/05] | English: | Ventilation panel for electromagnetic shielding | [1986/05] | French: | Panneau de ventilation pour blindage électromagnétique | [1986/05] | Examination procedure | 13.06.1986 | Examination requested [1986/34] | 03.11.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.03.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.06.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 17.06.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.06.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.07.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.07.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3253082 (KNUT BUSET); | [A]DE1591084 (ITT IND GMBH DEUTSCHE); | [A]US3584134 (NICHOLS FREDERICK J, et al); | [AD]US3821463 (BAKKER W) |