EP0176113 - Process for the treatment of rice to the purpose of improving its quality characteristics on cooking [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.04.1988 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RISERIE VIRGINIO CURTI S.p.A. Piazza Cordusio 2 I-20121 Milano / IT | [1986/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Curti, Edoardo Via del Sagredo 10 I-20121 Milano / IT | 02 /
Fossati, Giovanni Via Dalmazia 2 I-27029 Vigevano, Pavia / IT | [1986/14] | Representative(s) | Appoloni, Romano, et al Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.P.A. Corso di Porta Vittoria, 9 20122 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1986/14] | Appoloni, Romano, et al ING. BARZANO' & ZANARDO MILANO S.p.A. Via Borgonuovo 10 I-20121 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 85201123.8 | 09.07.1985 | [1986/14] | Priority number, date | IT19840022745 | 20.09.1984 Original published format: IT 2274584 | [1986/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0176113 | Date: | 02.04.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.02.1986 | Classification | IPC: | A23L1/182 | [1986/14] | CPC: |
A23L7/1963 (EP);
A23L7/196 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/14] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Behandlung von Reis zum Zwecke der Verbesserung seiner Qualitätscharakteristiken beim Kochen | [1986/14] | English: | Process for the treatment of rice to the purpose of improving its quality characteristics on cooking | [1986/14] | French: | Procédé pour le traitement de riz pour améliorer les caractéristiques de qualité pendant la cuisson | [1986/14] | File destroyed: | 12.08.1994 | Examination procedure | 16.09.1986 | Examination requested [1986/48] | 29.06.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.11.1987 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1988/23] | 18.12.1987 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1988/23] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1987 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1767016 (PFIZER); | [X]GB1327528 (INT FLABORS FRAGRANCES INC); | [A]DE2538076 (ANDO MOMOFUKU) |