EP0171110 - Polymeric antifouling compositions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.10.1989 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.10.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.12.1989 [1989/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shell Internationale Research Maatschappij B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 30 2596 HR Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1986/07] | For all designated states SHELL INTERNATIONALE RESEARCH MAATSCHAPPIJ B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 30 NL-2596 HR Den Haag / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Miller, Douglas c/o P.O. Box 1 Chester Cheshire / GB | 02 /
Shone, Edward Brian c/o P.O. Box 1 Chester Cheshire / GB | 03 /
Riches, Kenneth Maurice c/o P.O. Box 1 Chester Cheshire / GB | [1986/07] | Representative(s) | Aalbers, Onno, et al P.O. Box 162 2501 AN Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1986/07] | Aalbers, Onno, et al P.O. Box 162 NL-2501 AN The Hague / NL | Application number, filing date | 85201151.9 | 09.07.1985 | [1986/07] | Priority number, date | GB19840017876 | 13.07.1984 Original published format: GB 8417876 | [1986/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0171110 | Date: | 12.02.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0171110 | Date: | 21.12.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.12.1985 | Classification | IPC: | C09D5/16, C09D3/82, B32B25/08 | [1986/07] | CPC: |
B32B25/08 (EP,US);
C09D5/14 (KR);
B32B25/20 (US);
B32B7/12 (US);
C09D5/1693 (EP);
B32B2305/72 (US);
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1986/07] | Title | German: | Polymer bewuchsverhindernde Zusammensetzungen | [1986/07] | English: | Polymeric antifouling compositions | [1986/07] | French: | Compositions de polymères contre la salissure | [1986/07] | Examination procedure | 19.06.1986 | Examination requested [1986/37] | 20.03.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.08.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.03.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.06.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.09.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 20.09.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.09.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.05.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.05.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP78137231 ; | [A]US4035546 (RUPPERT JR EMILE); | [Y]US4177301 (SMITH ALFRED H JR [US]); | [A]EP0063388 (SHELL INT RESEARCH [NL]); | [Y]EP0089071 (SHELL INT RESEARCH [NL]) | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 90, no. 14, April 1979, page 107, no. 105785w, Columbus, Ohio, US; & JP - A - 78 137 231 (CHUGOKU MARINE PAINTS LTD.) 30-11-1978, & JP78137231 A 00000000 |