EP0172593 - Short detector for fusible link array [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.11.1990 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ADVANCED MICRO DEVICES, INC. 901 Thompson Place P.O. Box 3453 Sunnyvale CA 94088-3453 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1989/40] | For all designated states ADVANCED MICRO DEVICES, INC. 901 Thompson Place P.O. Box 3453 Sunnyvale, CA 94088 / US | ||
Former [1986/09] | For all designated states Monolithic Memories, Inc. 2175 Mission College Blvd. Santa Clara, CA 95050 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bosnyak, Bob 777 San Antonio Road, No. 116 Palo Alto California 94303 / US | 02 /
Chan, Albert 1786 Boncheff Drive San Jose California 95122 / US | 03 /
Fitzpatrick, Mark 899 S. Winchester Boulevard No. 236 San Jose California 95128 / US | 04 /
Gouldsberry, Gary 1324 S. Winchester Boulevard No. 73 San Jose California 95128 / US | 05 /
Tsui, Cyrus 2750 Middleborough Circle San Jose California 95132 / US | 06 /
Chan, Andrew K. 138 Sudbury Drive Mitpitas California 95035 / US | [1986/09] | Representative(s) | Noz, Franciscus Xaverius, et al Algemeen Octrooibureau P.O. Box 645 5600 AP Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1986/09] | Noz, Franciscus Xaverius, Ir., et al Algemeen Octrooibureau P.O. Box 645 NL-5600 AP Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 85201238.4 | 26.07.1985 | [1986/09] | Priority number, date | US19840635861 | 30.07.1984 Original published format: US 635861 | [1986/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0172593 | Date: | 26.02.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0172593 | Date: | 05.03.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.01.1986 | Classification | IPC: | G11C29/00, G01R31/02 | [1986/09] | CPC: |
G01R31/52 (EP,US);
G11C29/02 (EP,US);
G11C29/50 (EP,US);
G11C29/50008 (EP,US);
G11C17/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1986/09] | Title | German: | Kurzschlussdetektor für eine programmierbare Schaltungsmatrix | [1986/09] | English: | Short detector for fusible link array | [1986/09] | French: | Détecteur de courts-circuits pour matrice programmable à fusible | [1986/09] | File destroyed: | 14.06.1996 | Examination procedure | 27.08.1986 | Examination requested [1986/44] | 20.02.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.06.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.11.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.03.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.07.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1991/02] | 03.08.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1991/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.06.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.06.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.05.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.05.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2296181 (CONSTR TELEPHONIQUES [FR]); | [A]US2825824 (PEROLINI MARCEL C) | [A] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, vol. 18, no. 6, November 1975, page 1935-1936, New York, US; P.H. SMITH: "Automatic testing of leakage current monitor for bipolar integrated circuit" |