EP0173383 - Processor for processing data according to different modes, and suitable multiplying device for such a processor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.02.1991 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.1991 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CH, LI | published on 23.10.1991 [1991/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TELECOMMUNICATIONS RADIOELECTRIQUES ET TELEPHONIQUES T.R.T. 88, rue Brillat Savarin 75013 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1986/10] | For all designated states TELECOMMUNICATIONS RADIOELECTRIQUES ET TELEPHONIQUES T.R.T. 88, rue Brillat Savarin F-75013 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mary, Luc SOCIETE CIVILE S.P.I.D. 209 rue de l'Université F-75007 Paris / FR | 02 /
Barazesh, Bahman SOCIETE CIVILE S.P.I.D. 209 rue de l'Université F-75007 Paris / FR | [1986/10] | Representative(s) | Chaffraix, Jean, et al Société Civile SPID, 156, Boulevard Haussmann 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1986/10] | Chaffraix, Jean, et al Société Civile S.P.I.D. 156, Boulevard Haussmann F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 85201271.5 | 06.08.1985 | [1986/10] | Priority number, date | FR19840012799 | 14.08.1984 Original published format: FR 8412799 | FR19840012801 | 14.08.1984 Original published format: FR 8412801 | [1986/10] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0173383 | Date: | 05.03.1986 | Language: | FR | [1986/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0173383 | Date: | 18.04.1990 | Language: | FR | [1990/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.12.1985 | Classification | IPC: | G06F7/48, G06F9/30, G06F7/544, G06F7/52 | [1986/10] | CPC: |
G06F7/5324 (EP,US);
G06F7/4812 (EP,US);
G06F7/5443 (EP,US);
G06F7/57 (EP,US);
G06F9/30014 (EP,US);
G06F9/30036 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1986/10] | Title | German: | Prozessor zur Verarbeitung von Daten verschiedener Darstellungsarten und geeignetes Multipliziergerät für einen solchen Prozessor | [1986/10] | English: | Processor for processing data according to different modes, and suitable multiplying device for such a processor | [1986/10] | French: | Processeur pour effectuer suivant différents modes le traitement de données et dispositif de multiplication convenant pour un tel processeur | [1986/10] | Examination procedure | 29.08.1986 | Examination requested [1986/44] | 22.07.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.01.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.06.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.10.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.01.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 18.01.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.01.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.08.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.08.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.08.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Licence(s) | ID: | 01 00/not-exclusive | For: | FR | Licencee: | L'ETAT - administration des P.T.T. - Centre National d'Etudes des Télécommunications 38-49 rue du Général Leclerc F-92131 Issy les Moulineaux / FR | Date: | 02.09.1986 |
Former [1986/43] | ID: | 01 00/not-exclusive | |
For: | FR | ||
Licencee: | L'ETAT - Administration des P.T.T. - Centre National d'Etudes des Télécommunications 38-40 rue du Général Leclerc F-92131 Issy les Moulineaux / FR | ||
Date: | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 18.04.1990 | SE | 18.04.1990 | BE | 31.08.1990 | CH | 31.08.1990 | LI | 31.08.1990 | [1991/43] |
Former [1991/38] | NL | 18.04.1990 | |
SE | 18.04.1990 | ||
BE | 31.08.1990 | ||
Former [1991/17] | NL | 18.04.1990 | |
SE | 18.04.1990 | ||
Former [1990/50] | SE | 18.04.1990 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO8001423 (WESTERN ELECTRIC CO [US]) | Examination | EP0051422 |