EP0178001 - Process for cleaning of waste materials by refining and/or elimination of biologically Difficult to degrade halogen-, nitrogen- and/or sulfur compounds [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.05.1992 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.07.1992 [1992/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kinetics Technology International B.V. Bredewater 26 NL-2715 CA Zoetermeer / NL | [1986/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Visser, Leendert Esdoornstraat 25 NL-3235 VE Rockanje / NL | 02 /
Laghate, Ashok Shankar Van Goghstraat 33 NL-2712 SK Zoetermeer / NL | [1986/16] | Representative(s) | van der Saag, Johannes, et al Octrooibureau Vriesendorp & Gaade Dr. Kuyperstraat 6, Postbus 266 2501 AW 's-Gravenhage / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1986/16] | van der Saag, Johannes, et al Octrooibureau Vriesendorp & Gaade Dr. Kuyperstraat 6, Postbus 266 NL-2501 AW 's-Gravenhage / NL | Application number, filing date | 85201465.3 | 13.09.1985 | [1986/16] | Priority number, date | NL19840002837 | 14.09.1984 Original published format: NL 8402837 | [1986/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0178001 | Date: | 16.04.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0178001 | Date: | 24.07.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.02.1986 | Classification | IPC: | C10G67/06, C10M175/02, // A62D3/00 | [1986/16] | CPC: |
A62D3/37 (EP,US);
C10G67/06 (EP,US);
C10M175/0041 (EP,US);
A62D2101/22 (EP,US);
A62D2101/26 (EP,US);
A62D2101/28 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/16] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Reinigung von Abfallmaterialien durch Raffinierung und/oder Entfernung von biologisch, schwierig abbrechbaren Halogen-, Stickstoff- und/oder Schwefelverbindungen | [1986/16] | English: | Process for cleaning of waste materials by refining and/or elimination of biologically Difficult to degrade halogen-, nitrogen- and/or sulfur compounds | [1986/16] | French: | Procédé pour la purification de matériaux de rebut par raffinage et/ou élimination de composés halogéniques, nitriques et/ou sulfuriques difficiles à éliminer biologiquement | [1986/16] | Examination procedure | 15.09.1986 | Examination requested [1986/47] | 22.03.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.07.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.11.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.05.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.07.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.11.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.01.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.04.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.06.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.08.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.11.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.01.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.03.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 20.03.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.04.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.08.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.08.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.08.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.08.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3691152 (NELSON GERALD V, et al); | [A]US3876533 (MYERS GARY A); | [Y]NL7711298 (KINETICS TECHNOLOGY); | [X]US4247389 (JOHNSON MARVIN M, et al); | [X]US4431523 (TABLER DONALD C [US], et al); | [X]DE3405858 (EXXON RESEARCH ENGINEERING CO [US]) |