EP0178701 - Improved scales [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.08.1989 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.1989 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.09.1989 [1989/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Baccini, Giovanni Via del Pignone 30 R I-50142 Firenze / IT | [1986/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1986/17] | Representative(s) | Faraggiana, Vittorio, et al Ingg. Guzzi & Ravizza S.r.l. Via Vincenzo Monti 8 20123 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1986/17] | Faraggiana, Vittorio, Dr. Ing., et al Ingg. Guzzi & Ravizza S.r.l. Via Vincenzo Monti 8 I-20123 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 85201468.7 | 16.09.1985 | [1986/17] | Priority number, date | IT19840023539U | 17.10.1984 Original published format: IT 2353984 U | [1986/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0178701 | Date: | 23.04.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0178701 | Date: | 15.04.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.02.1987 | Classification | IPC: | G01G3/02, G01G23/01 | [1986/17] | CPC: |
G01G23/01 (EP,US);
G01G19/44 (EP,US);
G01G3/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, SE [1986/17] | Title | German: | Waagen | [1986/17] | English: | Improved scales | [1986/17] | French: | Balances | [1986/17] | File destroyed: | 19.07.1995 | Examination procedure | 30.09.1987 | Examination requested [1987/49] | 27.11.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.02.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.06.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.09.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.03.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 03.04.1989 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1989/39] | 28.04.1989 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1989/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.09.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.1988 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB942174 (HANSON SCALE CO); | [A]GB1176464 (HOLLANDS & BLAIR LTD); | [A]GB1340035 (HOLLANDS BLAIR LTD) |