EP0183286 - Attachment construction for the attachment of a woven filter to a press plate of a cocoa press [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.03.1990 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.03.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.05.1990 [1990/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states B.V. MACHINEFABRIEK P.M. DUYVIS P.O. Box 10 NL-1540 AA Koog aan de Zaan / NL | [1986/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kruiver, Gerardus Binnenwijzend 50 Nl-1617 KW Westwoud/Drechterland / NL | [1986/23] | Representative(s) | van der Beek, George F., et al Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS 's-Gravenhage / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1986/23] | van der Beek, George Frans, Ir., et al Nederlandsch Octrooibureau Scheveningseweg 82 P.O. Box 29720 NL-2502 LS 's-Gravenhage / NL | Application number, filing date | 85201549.4 | 25.09.1985 | [1986/23] | Priority number, date | NL19840002993 | 01.10.1984 Original published format: NL 8402993 | [1986/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0183286 | Date: | 04.06.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0183286 | Date: | 10.05.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.02.1986 | Classification | IPC: | A23G1/08, B30B9/04 | [1986/23] | CPC: |
B30B9/045 (EP,US);
A23G1/08 (EP,US);
B30B9/26 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, IT, LI, NL [1989/15] |
Former [1986/23] | CH, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL | Title | German: | Befestigungssystem zur Befestigung eines gewebten Filters auf die Platte einer Kakaopresse | [1986/23] | English: | Attachment construction for the attachment of a woven filter to a press plate of a cocoa press | [1986/23] | French: | Système de montage pour fixer un filtre tissé sur le plateau d'une presse à cacao | [1986/23] | Examination procedure | 03.12.1986 | Examination requested [1987/06] | 19.10.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.02.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.04.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 09.06.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.10.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.11.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.02.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 08.02.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.02.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2715965 (CARVER FRED S) |