EP0177104 - Device for coupling a light source and a light guide [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.01.1990 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 31.10.2007 [2007/44] | Applicant(s) | For:FR
LABORATOIRES D'ELECTRONIQUE ET DE PHYSIQUE APPLIQUEE L.E.P. 3, Avenue Descartes 94450 Limeil-Brévannes / FR | For:DE
GB
IT
SE
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1986/15] | For:FR
LABORATOIRES D'ELECTRONIQUE ET DE PHYSIQUE APPLIQUEE L.E.P. 3, Avenue Descartes F-94450 Limeil-Brévannes / FR | ||
For:DE
GB
IT
SE
Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hily, Claude Emile Société Civile S.P.I.D. 209 rue de l'Université F-75007 Paris / FR | 02 /
Michel, Jaqueline-Madeleine Société Civile S.P.I.D. 209 rue de l'Université F-75007 Paris / FR | [1986/15] | Representative(s) | Landousy, Christian, et al Philips IP&S France Société Civile SPID 33 rue de Verdun BP 313 92156 Suresnes Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1986/15] | Landousy, Christian, et al Société Civile S.P.I.D. 156, Boulevard Haussmann F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 85201575.9 | 01.10.1985 | [1986/15] | Priority number, date | FR19840015311 | 05.10.1984 Original published format: FR 8415311 | [1986/15] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0177104 | Date: | 09.04.1986 | Language: | FR | [1986/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0177104 | Date: | 01.03.1989 | Language: | FR | [1989/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.01.1986 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/42 | [1986/15] | CPC: |
G02B6/4206 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1986/15] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Kupplung von einer Lightquelle mit einem Lichtwellenleiter | [1986/15] | English: | Device for coupling a light source and a light guide | [1986/15] | French: | Dispositif de couplage d'une source lumineuse et d'un guide d'onde lumineuse | [1986/15] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 29.09.1986 | Examination requested [1986/48] | 13.04.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.08.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.11.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 15.11.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.12.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.10.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 01.03.1989 | SE | 01.03.1989 | [1999/42] |
Former [1989/36] | SE | 01.03.1989 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP57211288 ; | [A]JP5766686 ; | [A]JP5413356 ; | [A]US3932184 (COHEN LEONARD GEORGE, et al) | [A] - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 7, no. 65 (E-165) [1210], 18 mars 1983; & JP - A - 57 211 288 (NIPPON DENSHIN DENWA KOSHA) 25-12-1982, & JP57211288 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 6, no. 144, 3 août 1982, page 122; & JP - A - 57 66 686 (NIPPON DENSHIN DENWA KOSHA) 22.04.1982, & JP5766686 A 00000000 | [A] - IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON MICROWAVE THEORY AND TECHNIQUES, vol. MTT-30, no. 2, février 1982, pages 121-131, New York, US; K. SHIRAHATA et al.: "Recent developments in fiber optic devices" | [A] - LASER FOCUS, vol. 17, no. 11, novembre 1981, pages 119-120, New York, US; "Fiberscan. Singlemode fiber with consistent quality made in Britain and Japan" | [A] - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 3, no. 36, 27 mars 1979, page 5 E 100; & JP - A - 54 13 356 (SUMITOMO DENKI KOGYO K.K.) 31-01-1979, & JP5413356 A 00000000 |