EP0178031 - Washing machine with a device for determining the turbidity of the water [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.11.1989 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.11.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.01.1990 [1990/01] | Applicant(s) | For:FR
LABORATOIRES D'ELECTRONIQUE ET DE PHYSIQUE APPLIQUEE L.E.P. 3, Avenue Descartes 94450 Limeil-Brévannes / FR | For:DE
GB
IT
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1986/16] | For:FR
LABORATOIRES D'ELECTRONIQUE ET DE PHYSIQUE APPLIQUEE L.E.P. 3, Avenue Descartes F-94450 Limeil-Brévannes / FR | ||
For:DE
GB
IT
Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hazan, Jean-Pierre Société Civile S.P.I.D. 209, rue de l'Université F-75007 Paris / FR | 02 /
Steers, Michel Société Civile S.P.I.D. 209, rue de l'Université F-75007 Paris / FR | 03 /
Nagel, Jean-Louis Société Civile S.P.I.D. 209, rue de l'Université F-75007 Paris / FR | [1986/16] | Representative(s) | Landousy, Christian, et al Philips IP&S France Société Civile SPID 33 rue de Verdun BP 313 92156 Suresnes Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1986/16] | Landousy, Christian, et al Société Civile S.P.I.D. 156, Boulevard Haussmann F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 85201649.2 | 09.10.1985 | [1986/16] | Priority number, date | FR19840015672 | 12.10.1984 Original published format: FR 8415672 | [1986/16] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0178031 | Date: | 16.04.1986 | Language: | FR | [1986/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0178031 | Date: | 18.01.1989 | Language: | FR | [1989/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.02.1986 | Classification | IPC: | D06F39/00 | [1986/16] | CPC: |
D06F34/22 (EP,US);
D06F2103/20 (EP,US);
D06F2105/02 (EP,US);
D06F2105/56 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1986/16] | Title | German: | Waschmaschine mit einer Spülwasserverschmutzung ermittelnden Messeinrichtung | [1986/16] | English: | Washing machine with a device for determining the turbidity of the water | [1986/16] | French: | Machine à laver le linge ou autres comportant un dispositif de la mesure de la turbidité de l'eau | [1986/16] | Examination procedure | 29.09.1986 | Examination requested [1986/48] | 11.01.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.04.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.07.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 26.07.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.10.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.10.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]JP5466567 ; | [A]EP0058576 (EATON SA MONACO [MC]); | [A]DE1259827 (SIEMENS ELEKTROGERAETE GMBH); | [A]US3114253 (MOREY EVERETT D, et al); | [A]US4257708 (FUKUDA NORISUKE) | [AD] - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 3, no. 88 (M-67), 27 juillet 1979, page 151 M 67; & JP - A - 54 66 567 (TOKYO SHIBAURA DENKI K.K.) 29.05.1979, & JP5466567 A 00000000 |