EP0188839 - Self-oscillating power-supply circuit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition procedure closed Status updated on 06.02.1992 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.1998 | Change - name/address | published on 26.08.1998 [1998/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1998/35] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [1986/31] | For all designated states Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
van den Akker, Jouw c/o INT. OCTROOIBUREAU B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
Plagge, Joseph Antonius Maria c/o INT. OCTROOIBUREAU B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [1986/31] | Representative(s) | Peters, Rudolf Johannes, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1986/31] | Peters, Rudolf Johannes, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 85202063.5 | 13.12.1985 | [1986/31] | Priority number, date | NL19850000154 | 22.01.1985 Original published format: NL 8500154 | [1986/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0188839 | Date: | 30.07.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0188839 | Date: | 29.11.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.04.1986 | Classification | IPC: | H02M3/338 | [1986/31] | CPC: |
H02M3/3385 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1986/31] | Title | German: | Selbstschwingende Stromversorgungsschaltung | [1986/31] | English: | Self-oscillating power-supply circuit | [1986/31] | French: | Dispositif d'alimentation en auto-oscillation | [1986/31] | Examination procedure | 26.01.1987 | Examination requested [1987/14] | 19.05.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.07.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.11.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.06.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.08.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 28.08.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
29.08.1990
12.09.1990
ADMISSIBLE Braun AG Patentabteilung Postfach 11 20 D-61466 Kronberg / DE Opponent's representative Einsele, Rolf Braun Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 1120 61466 Kronberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/43] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
29.08.1990
12.09.1990
ADMISSIBLE Braun AG Patentabteilung Postfach 11 20 D-61466 Kronberg / DE Opponent's representative Einsele, Rolf Braun Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 11 20 D-61466 Kronberg / DE | 08.10.1990 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 14.02.1991 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 01.03.1991 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02) | 10.05.1991 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 24.07.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02) | 05.10.1991 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 31.10.1991 | Despatch of communication that the opposition procedure will be closed | 10.11.1991 | Legal effect of closure of opposition procedure [1992/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.12.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3047103 (BECKER KLAUS DIPL ING); | [A]EP0056593 (BRAUN AG [DE]); | [A]DE3300285 (BRAUN AG [DE]) |