EP0150903 - Method and apparatus for dynamic alignment [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.09.1989 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CARROLL TOUCH TECHNOLOGY, INC. 2800 Oakmont Center Round Rock Texas 78664 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1985/32] | For all designated states CARROLL TOUCH TECHNOLOGY, INC. 2800 Oakmont Center Round Rock Texas 78664 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Carroll, Arthur B. 207 Ridgewood Drive Georgetown Texas 78626 / US | 02 /
Borovec, Richard T. 1216 West John Street Champaign Illinois 61821 / US | [1985/32] | Representative(s) | Warren, Keith Stanley, et al Baron Warren Redfern Cambridge House 100 Cambridge Grove Hammersmith, London W6 0LE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/33] | Warren, Keith Stanley, et al BARON & WARREN 18 South End Kensington London W8 5BU / GB | ||
Former [1985/32] | Gray, Robin Oliver BARON & WARREN 18 South End Kensington London W8 5BU / GB | Application number, filing date | 85300056.0 | 04.01.1985 | [1985/32] | Priority number, date | US19840568045 | 04.01.1984 Original published format: US 568045 | US19840680235 | 10.12.1984 Original published format: US 680235 | [1985/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0150903 | Date: | 07.08.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0150903 | Date: | 03.08.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.06.1988 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/03, G06F3/037, H04N3/22 | [1988/16] | CPC: |
G06F3/0418 (EP,US);
G06F3/042 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1985/32] | G06K11/06 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1985/32] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum dynamischen Ausrichten | [1985/32] | English: | Method and apparatus for dynamic alignment | [1985/32] | French: | Dispositif et méthode pour l'ajustage dynamique | [1985/32] | File destroyed: | 12.05.1995 | Examination procedure | 06.02.1989 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1989/45] | 13.06.1989 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1989/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.01.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.01.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 17.04.1989 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3743883 (BURNS J); | [X]US4234893 (PETERS DAVID L) |