EP0150931 - Reinforced composite structures [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 29.12.1992 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.12.1992 | Opposition rejected | published on 17.02.1993 [1993/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IMPERIAL CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES PLC Imperial Chemical House, Millbank London SW1P 3JF / GB | [1985/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cogswell, Frederic Neil 10 Latimer Lane Guisborough Cleveland / GB | 02 /
Measuria, Umakant 6 Wainstones Close Great Ayton North Yorkshire / GB | [1985/32] | Representative(s) | Graham, John George, et al Intellectual Property Department ICI Materials P.O. Box 90 Wilton Cleveland TS90 8JE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/02] | Graham, John George, et al Intellectual Property Department ICI Materials P.O. Box 90 Wilton Cleveland TS90 8JE / GB | ||
Former [1985/32] | Downer, John Michael ICI Group Patents Services Dept. PO Box 6 Shire Park Bessemer Road Welwyn Garden City Herts, AL7 1HD / GB | Application number, filing date | 85300178.2 | 10.01.1985 | [1985/32] | Priority number, date | GB19840002192 | 27.01.1984 Original published format: GB 8402192 | GB19840005828 | 06.03.1984 Original published format: GB 8405828 | [1985/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0150931 | Date: | 07.08.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0150931 | Date: | 15.01.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0150931 | Date: | 11.04.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.11.1985 | Classification | IPC: | C08K13/04, C08J5/04, // (C08K13/04, 7:02, 3:00) | [1985/32] | CPC: |
B29C70/025 (EP,US);
C08J5/04 (EP,US);
C08K13/04 (EP,US);
C08K7/02 (EP,US);
B29K2105/101 (EP,US);
B29K2995/0077 (EP,US);
Y10S428/902 (EP,US);
Y10T428/249945 (EP,US);
Y10T428/249946 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1985/32] | Title | German: | Verstärkte Verbundstrukturen | [1985/32] | English: | Reinforced composite structures | [1985/32] | French: | Structures composites renforcées | [1985/32] | Examination procedure | 04.06.1986 | Examination requested [1986/32] | 14.08.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.01.1988 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 28.03.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.07.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 03.10.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.05.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.08.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 17.08.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
11.01.1991
13.02.1991
ADMISSIBLE HOECHST Aktiengesellschaft Zentrale Patentabteilung Postfach 80 03 20 D-65903 Frankfurt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/11] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
11.01.1991
13.02.1991
ADMISSIBLE HOECHST Aktiengesellschaft Zentrale Patentabteilung Postfach 80 03 20 D-65903 Frankfurt / DE | 21.02.1991 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 14.08.1991 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 22.08.1991 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M06) | 02.03.1992 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 16.09.1992 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 26.09.1992 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [1993/07] | Request for further processing for: | 28.03.1988 | Request for further processing filed | 28.03.1988 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 18.04.1988 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.12.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.12.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.12.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 11.04.1990 | CH | 31.01.1991 | LI | 31.01.1991 | [1992/05] |
Former [1991/17] | AT | 11.04.1990 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]AT291606B (MANCAR TRUST); | [AD]EP0056703 |