EP0149534 - Novel thioketene derivatives and process for the preparation thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 05.06.1990 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tanabe Seiyaku Co., Ltd. No. 21 Dosho-machi 3-chome Higashi-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1985/30] | For all designated states Tanabe Seiyaku Co., Ltd. No. 21 Dosho-machi 3-chome Higashi-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Iijima, Ikuo No. 1-1-8-403 Ohara 7-chome Urawa-shi Saitama-ken / JP | 02 /
Homma, Koichi No. 14-1-219 Oyamahigashi-cho Itabashi-ku Tokyo-to / JP | 03 /
Saiga, Yutaka No. 699-14 Oaza-Ageo-Shimo Ageo-shi Saitama-ken / JP | 04 /
Matsuoka, Yuzo No. 5-7, Takabe-dai 3-chome Tondabayashi-shi Osaka-fu / JP | 05 /
Matsumoto, Mamoru No. 3-35, Ayameike-Minami 3-chome Nara-shi Nara-ken / JP | [1985/30] | Representative(s) | Shipton, Gordon Owen, et al W.P. Thompson & Co. Coopers Building Church Street Liverpool L1 3AB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1985/30] | Shipton, Gordon Owen, et al W.P. THOMPSON & CO. Coopers Building Church Street Liverpool L1 3AB / GB | Application number, filing date | 85300187.3 | 11.01.1985 | [1985/30] | Priority number, date | GB19840001010 | 14.01.1984 Original published format: GB 8401010 | GB19840009431 | 11.04.1984 Original published format: GB 8409431 | [1985/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0149534 | Date: | 24.07.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0149534 | Date: | 09.09.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.07.1987 | Classification | IPC: | C07D409/04, C07D213/69, C07D207/44, C07D223/10, A61K31/395 | [1985/30] | CPC: |
C07D213/40 (EP,US);
C07D213/69 (EP,KR,US);
A61P1/16 (EP);
C07D207/38 (EP,US);
C07D211/86 (EP,US);
C07D211/90 (EP,US);
C07D213/38 (EP,US);
C07D223/10 (EP,US);
C07D339/06 (EP,US);
C07D401/06 (EP,US);
C07D409/04 (EP,US);
C07D409/12 (EP,US);
C07D409/14 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1985/30] | Title | German: | Thioketen-Derivate und Verfahren zur Herstellung | [1985/30] | English: | Novel thioketene derivatives and process for the preparation thereof | [1985/30] | French: | Dérivés de thiolétènes et procédé pour leur préparation | [1985/30] | File destroyed: | 14.06.1996 | Examination procedure | 18.09.1987 | Examination requested [1987/46] | 19.09.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.01.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.03.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 18.05.1990 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1990/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.01.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.01.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.01.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS5022092B ; | [A]JPS49101528 | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 69, no. 16, October 14, 1968, page 6285, ref.no. 67300r; Columbus, Ohio, (US) K.A. JENSEN et al: "Thioacids and their derivatives. XIV. Reactions of carbon disulfide with active methylene compounds."; & ACTA CHEM. SCAND. 1968, 22(4)1107-28 | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 69, no. 13, September 23, 1968, pages 5529-5530, ref.no. 59154f; Columbus, Ohio, (US) P. PAPINI et al: "Alkylation of pyrazoline- and pyrazolidinedithiocarboxylic acids IV.; & GAZZ. CHIM. ITAL. 1968, 98(3)245-55 | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 85, no. 1, July 5, 1976, page 110, ref.no. 1200g; Columbus, Ohio(US); & JP-B-50 022 092 (NIHON NOHYAKU CO. LTD) 28-07-1975 | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 83, no. 1, July 7, 1975, page 221, ref.no. 2272c; Columbus, Ohio(US); & JP-A-49 101 528 (NIHON HOHYAKU CO. LTD) 25-09-1974 | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 93, no. 23, December 8, 1980, page 323, ref.no. 225700y; Columbus, Ohio, (US) F. EIDEN et al: "Clobazam (Frisium). A contribution to the analysis of a psychopharmacological agent."; & DTSCH. APOTH.-ZTG. 1980, 120(21)933-7 |