EP0187433 - Powdery pharmaceutical composition suitable for application to mucosa of oral or nasal cavity [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.10.1991 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.10.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.12.1991 [1991/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TEIJIN LIMITED 11 Minami Honmachi 1-chome Higashi-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1986/29] | For all designated states TEIJIN LIMITED 11 Minami Honmachi 1-chome Higashi-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Suzuki, Yoshiki 5-20-2, Tamadaira Hino-shi Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Ikura, Hiroshi Gurin-kopu Hino 2-501,2-14-1 Shinmei Hino-shi Tokyo / JP | [1986/29] | Representative(s) | Arthur, Bryan Edward, et al Withers & Rogers Goldings House 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1986/29] | Arthur, Bryan Edward, et al Withers & Rogers 4 Dyer's Buildings Holborn London EC1N 2JT / GB | Application number, filing date | 85300205.3 | 11.01.1985 | [1986/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0187433 | Date: | 16.07.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0187433 | Date: | 27.12.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.10.1985 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/06, A61K47/00, A61K47/12, A61K47/38 | [1990/52] | CPC: |
A61K47/12 (EP);
A61K9/0043 (EP);
A61K9/006 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1986/29] | A61K9/06, A61K47/00 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1986/29] | Title | German: | Pulverige pharmazeutische Zusammensetzung zur Anwendung auf die Schleimhaut der Mund- oder Nasenhöhle | [1986/29] | English: | Powdery pharmaceutical composition suitable for application to mucosa of oral or nasal cavity | [1986/29] | French: | Composition pharmaceutique poudreuse pour l'application sur la muqueuse de la cavité orale ou nasale | [1986/29] | Examination procedure | 15.09.1986 | Examination requested [1986/46] | 22.04.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.10.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.01.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.07.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.10.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 01.12.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.06.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.09.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 14.09.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.09.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.12.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.12.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]EP0023359 (TEIJIN LTD [JP]); | [Y]US3276959 (LUDWIG RITTER, et al); | [A]US4289764 (YARROW HYMAN, et al) | by applicant | JPS57118511 | US4294829 |