EP0154391 - Optical Computation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.07.1991 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STC PLC 10, Maltravers Street London, WC2R 3HA / GB | [1986/49] |
Former [1986/24] | For all designated states STC PLC 190 Strand London, WC2R 1DU / GB | ||
Former [1985/37] | For all designated states STANDARD TELEPHONES AND CABLES PUBLIC LIMITED COMPANY 190 Strand London, WC2R 1DU / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Byron, Kevin Christopher 8 Jervis Road Bishop's Stortford Hertfordshire / GB | [1985/37] | Representative(s) | Dennis, Mark Charles Nortel Networks Intellectual Property Law Group London Road Harlow Essex CM17 9NA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1985/37] | Dennis, Mark Charles Nortel Limited Patents and Licensing West Road Harlow Essex CM20 2SH / GB | Application number, filing date | 85300358.0 | 18.01.1985 | [1985/37] | Priority number, date | GB19840004966 | 25.02.1984 Original published format: GB 8404966 | [1985/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0154391 | Date: | 11.09.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0154391 | Date: | 20.07.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.06.1988 | Classification | IPC: | G06G9/00 | [1985/37] | CPC: |
G06E3/005 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1985/37] | Title | German: | Optische Berechnung | [1985/37] | English: | Optical Computation | [1985/37] | French: | Calcul optique | [1985/37] | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Examination procedure | 01.11.1988 | Examination requested [1989/01] | 10.05.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.06.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.09.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.11.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.11.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 22.11.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.02.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1991/37] | 26.03.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1991/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.12.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.11.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.11.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.11.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.1991 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - OPTICS COMMUNICATIONS, vol. 40, no. 2, 15th December 1981, pages 86-90, Amsterdam, NL; H.J. CAULFIELD et al.: "Optical implementation of systolic array processing" |