EP0154409 - Testing material for detecting alcohols [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 29.10.1990 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UNITIKA LTD. No. 50, Higashihonmachi 1-chome Amagasaki-shi Hyogo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1985/37] | For all designated states UNITIKA LTD. No. 50, Higashihonmachi 1-chome Amagasaki-shi Hyogo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Watanabe, Mitsuo 32, Satojiri Uji Uji-shi Kyoto / JP | 02 /
Suzuki, Tadao 151-30-3D-1109, Nimaru-cho Mukaijima Mukaijima, Fushimi-ku, Kyoto-shi, Kyoto / JP | 03 /
Kageyama, Masao 55, Kageyama Uji Uji-shi Kyoto / JP | [1985/37] | Representative(s) | Pearce, Anthony Richmond, et al Marks & Clerk LLP Alpha Tower Suffolk Street Queensway Birmingham B1 1TT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1985/37] | Pearce, Anthony Richmond, et al MARKS & CLERK, Alpha Tower, Suffolk Street Queensway Birmingham B1 1TT / GB | Application number, filing date | 85300748.2 | 05.02.1985 | [1985/37] | Priority number, date | JP19840020367 | 06.02.1984 Original published format: JP 2036784 | JP19840026559 | 14.02.1984 Original published format: JP 2655984 | [1985/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0154409 | Date: | 11.09.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0154409 | Date: | 02.03.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.01.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/32 | [1985/37] | CPC: |
C12N9/0006 (EP);
C12Q1/32 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, NL [1985/37] | Title | German: | Testmaterial zum Nachweis von Alkoholen | [1985/37] | English: | Testing material for detecting alcohols | [1985/37] | French: | Composition d'essai pour la détection d'alcools | [1985/37] | File destroyed: | 14.06.1996 | Examination procedure | 24.08.1988 | Examination requested [1988/42] | 25.01.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 11.07.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1990/51] | 21.07.1990 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1990/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.02.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.02.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.02.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.02.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]EP0117032 ; | [X]DE3237233 ; | [X]FR2131504 | [YD] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 99, no. 21, 21st November 1983, page 283, abstract no. 171730m, Columbus, Ohio, US; K.A.J. WALSH et al.: "A soluble NADH dehydrogenase (NADH:ferricyanide oxidoreductase) from Thermus aquaticus T351", & BIOCHEM. J. 1983, 209(2), 427-33 | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 94, no. 17, 27th April 1981, pages 234-235, abstract no. 133850q, Columbus, Ohio, US; B.M. KERSHENGOL'TS et al.: "Some methods for the study of ethanol metabolism", & LAB. DELO 1981, (2), 126 |