EP0154484 - 7-D-Mandelamido-3-(1-sulfomethyltetrazol-5-YL)Thiomethyl-3-cephem-4-carboxylic acid monosodium salt [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.06.1989 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.06.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.08.1989 [1989/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SMITHKLINE BECKMAN CORPORATION P.O. Box 7929 1 Franklin Plaza Philadelphia Pennsylvania 19101 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1985/37] | For all designated states SMITHKLINE BECKMAN CORPORATION P.O. Box 7929 1 Franklin Plaza Philadelphia Pennsylvania 19101 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Polansky, Theodore John 738 Smoke Pipe Lane Harleysville Pennsylvania 19438 / US | [1985/37] | Representative(s) | Denerley, Paul Millington, et al Global Intellectual Property, AstraZeneca UK Limited, P.O. Box 272, Mereside, Alderley Park Macclesfield, Cheshire SK10 4TG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1985/37] | Denerley, Paul Millington, Dr., et al Smith Kline & French Laboratories Ltd Patent Department Mundells Welwyn Garden City Hertfordshire AL7 1EY / GB | Application number, filing date | 85301253.2 | 25.02.1985 | [1985/37] | Priority number, date | US19840584590 | 29.02.1984 Original published format: US 584590 | [1985/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0154484 | Date: | 11.09.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0154484 | Date: | 13.08.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0154484 | Date: | 24.08.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.06.1986 | Classification | IPC: | C07D501/36, A61K31/545 | [1985/37] | CPC: |
C07D501/36 (EP,KR,US);
A61P31/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1985/37] | Title | German: | 7-D-Mandelamido-3-(1-sulfomethyltetrazol-5-yl)thiomethyl-3-cephem-4-carboxylsäure-Monosodium-Salz | [1985/37] | English: | 7-D-Mandelamido-3-(1-sulfomethyltetrazol-5-YL)Thiomethyl-3-cephem-4-carboxylic acid monosodium salt | [1985/37] | French: | Sel monosodique de l'acide 7-D-mandelamido-3-(1-sulfométhyltétrazol-5-yl)thiométhyl-3-céphem-4-carboxylique | [1985/37] | Examination procedure | 01.03.1985 | Examination requested [1985/37] | 26.10.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.02.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.03.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 21.03.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.05.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.01.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.01.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US4048311 (BERGES DAVID A) |