Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] |
22.03.1989 | Refusal of application | published on 10.05.1989 [1989/19] |
01.09.1987 | First examination report | |
03.12.1985 | Publication of search report | published on 05.02.1986 [1986/06] |
12.07.1985 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 11.09.1985 [1985/37] |
12.07.1985 | Request for examination filed | published on 11.09.1985 [1985/37] |