EP0157503 - Production of low silica content, high purity alumina [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.04.1992 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.04.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.05.1992 [1992/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Condea Chemie GmbH Postfach 11 60, Fritz-Staiger-Strasse 15 D-25534 Brunsbüttel / DE | [1989/50] |
Former [1988/14] | For all designated states Ceralox Corporation 204 East 39th Street New York, New York 10016 / US | ||
Former [1985/41] | For all designated states ATLANTIC RICHFIELD COMPANY 515 South Flower Street Los Angeles California 90071 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Davis, Gerald E. 3500 W. Sweetwater Drive Tucson Arizona 85745 / US | [1985/41] | Representative(s) | Cropp, John Anthony David, et al MATHYS & SQUIRE 100 Grays Inn Road London, WC1X 8AL / GB | [1985/41] | Application number, filing date | 85301451.2 | 04.03.1985 | [1985/41] | Priority number, date | US19840589927 | 15.03.1984 Original published format: US 589927 | [1985/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0157503 | Date: | 09.10.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0157503 | Date: | 13.05.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0157503 | Date: | 05.06.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.03.1987 | Classification | IPC: | C01F7/46 | [1985/41] | CPC: |
C01F7/56 (EP,US);
C01F7/47 (EP,US);
C01P2006/80 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL, SE [1985/41] | Title | German: | Herstellung von reinem Aluminiumoxid mit geringem Si02-Gehalt | [1985/41] | English: | Production of low silica content, high purity alumina | [1985/41] | French: | Production d'alumine de haute pureté à faible teneur en silice | [1985/41] | Examination procedure | 06.11.1987 | Examination requested [1988/02] | 30.11.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.03.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.12.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.04.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.07.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.12.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.02.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 21.02.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.03.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.05.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.05.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.05.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.1987 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   29.05.1987 | 31.03.1989 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   06.05.1989 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3959438 (MESSNER GEORG); | [A]DE2555875 (FINANCIAL MINING IND SHIP); | [A]US4222989 (BELSKY MILAN, et al); | [A]US4239735 (BAUER DONALD J [US], et al); | [A]WO8400534 (ATLANTIC RICHFIELD CO [US]) |